EP1144477 - COATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | [2001/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENN, David Robert 29 Wendover Road, Burnham Buckinghamshire SL1 7ND / GB | 02 /
LAM, Peter, Kwok, Hing Klovervang 35 DK-2970 Horsholm / DK | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 99963646.7 | 23.12.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999GB04422 | Priority number, date | GB19980028444 | 24.12.1998 Original published format: GB 9828444 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0039184 | Date: | 06.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1144477 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1144477 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/72, C09D175/04 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
C08G18/724 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2001/42] | English: | COATING COMPOSITION | [2001/42] | French: | COMPOSITION DE REVETEMENT | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 15.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.12.2003 | [2004/36] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2732182 (NL INDUSTRIES INC) [A] 11 * page 4, column 1, line 1 - page 7, line 29; claims 1-9 *; | [A]US4273912 (HARMER WALTER L) [A] 1,3-5,7,10-12,15-17 * column 2, line 1 - column 4, line 24; example -; claims 1-7 *; | JPS62169864 [ ] (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD); | [A]GB2187196 (GOSSELIN CLAUDE) [A] 1 * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 51; claim - *; | JPS6364739 [ ] (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | JPH0931412 [ ] (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [A] - "colored polyurethane elastomer-coated anticorrosive heavy duty steels", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (198809), vol. 109, no. 10, Database accession no. 75425v, page 111, column 2, XP002094191 [A] 1,3,5 * abstract * | [A] - "resin prime composition product", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 12, Database accession no. 247052, XP002094192 [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - "resin composition polyurethane coating", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 15, Database accession no. 161761, XP002094193 [A] 1,14 * abstract * |