EP1149310 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAAB AB 581 88 Linköping / SE | [2004/13] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states Saab Dynamics Aktiebolag 581 88 Linköping / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖRJESSON, Per Dotetorp 4343 S-430 31 sa / SE | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Holmberg, Magnus, et al Zacco Sweden AB Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Holmberg, Magnus, et al Albihns Stockholm AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 99963806.7 | 07.12.1999 | [2001/44] | WO1999SE02273 | Priority number, date | SE19980004285 | 11.12.1998 Original published format: SE 9804285 | [2001/44] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0039607 | Date: | 06.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1149310 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/89, G01S17/02, G01S17/87 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
G01S17/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR DETEKTIERUNG VON OBJEKTEN | [2001/44] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING OBJECTS | [2001/44] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION D'OBJETS | [2001/44] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.1999 | Translation filed | 11.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 11.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 14.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/15] | 06.03.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.05.2013 | 14.05.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5220164 (LIEBER ALBERT J [US], et al); | [X]EP0874218 (TOPCON CORP [JP]) |