EP1135166 - HAPTEN-CARRIER CONJUGATES FOR TREATING AND PREVENTING NICOTINE ADDICTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nabi Biopharmaceuticals 12280 Wilkins Avenue Rockville, MD 20852 / US | [2003/48] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states NABI 12280 Wilkins Avenue Rockville, MD 20852 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENNIFAR, Sofiane 2210 Bear Valley Terrace Silver Spring, MD 20906 / US | 02 /
FATTOM, Ali, Ibrahim 1710 Lorre Drive Rockville, MD 20852 / US | 03 /
NASO, Robert, B. 8630 Lochaven Drive Gaithersburg, MD 20882 / US | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Pohlman, Sandra M. Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99964009.7 | 01.12.1999 | [2001/39] | WO1999US28272 | Priority number, date | US19980201800 | 01.12.1998 Original published format: US 201800 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0032239 | Date: | 08.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1135166 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1135166 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1135166 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, A61K39/385 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
A61K39/0013 (EP,US);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K47/646 (EP,US);
A61P25/34 (EP);
C07K16/44 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6037 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6068 (EP,US);
Y10S435/975 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/39] | Extension states | AL | 05.02.2001 | LT | 05.02.2001 | LV | 05.02.2001 | MK | 05.02.2001 | RO | 05.02.2001 | SI | 05.02.2001 | Title | German: | HAPTEN-TRÄGER-KONJUGATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND VORBEUGUNG VON NIKOTINABHÄNGIGKEIT | [2001/39] | English: | HAPTEN-CARRIER CONJUGATES FOR TREATING AND PREVENTING NICOTINE ADDICTION | [2001/39] | French: | CONJUGUES HAPTENE-PORTEUR POUR TRAITER ET PREVENIR L'ACCOUTUMANCE A LA NICOTINE | [2004/18] |
Former [2001/39] | TONJUGUES HAPTENE-PORTEUR POUR TRAITER ET PREVENIR L'ACCOUTUMANCE A LA NICOTINE | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.03.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 30.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04024278.6 / EP1512414 | EP10179154.9 / EP2324855 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2005
21.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE Cytos Biotechnology AG Wagistrasse 25 8952 Schlieren / CH Opponent's representative Wichmann, Hendrik, et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2005
21.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE Cytos Biotechnology AG Wagistrasse 25 8952 Schlieren / CH Opponent's representative Wichmann, Hendrik, et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2005
21.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE Cytos Biotechnology AG Wagistrasse 25 8952 Schlieren / CH Opponent's representative Wichmann, Hendrik, et al, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2005
21.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE Cytos Biotechnology AG Wagistrasse 25 8952 Schlieren / CH Opponent's representative Wichmann, Hendrik, et al, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Postfach 86 08 80 81635 München / DE | 22.08.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.12.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.08.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.08.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.01.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 28.01.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/28] | 28.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 01.10.2008 | Appeal received No. T1903/08 | 10.12.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.01.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 30.09.2008 | Appeal received No. T1903/08 | 09.12.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.01.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 28.01.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.02.2013 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 13.10.2004 | LI | 13.10.2004 | CY | 01.12.2012 | IT | 01.12.2012 | ES | 02.12.2012 | [2020/33] |
Former [2014/03] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
CY | 01.12.2012 | ||
IT | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
CY | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
Former [2007/42] | deleted | ||
Former [2007/23] | CY | 01.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9203163 (CERNY ERICH H [CH]); | [Y]WO9323076 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]); | [Y]WO9630049 (IMMULOGIC PHARMA CORP [US]); | [XY]WO9814216 (IMMULOGIC PHARMA CORP [US]); |