EP1140616 - SEMI-IMMERSIBLE HEAVY-LIFT CARGOBOAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSEN, Peter Triftstr. 27 D-21075 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
VAN MAMEREN, Hans Specerijenhof 53 NL-3063 BX Rotterdam / NL | [2001/41] | Application number, filing date | 99964416.4 | 10.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999DE03947 | Priority number, date | DE19981060071 | 23.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19860071 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0038976 | Date: | 06.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1140616 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1140616 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B63B35/00, B63B35/42, B63H23/24, // (B63B1/04, 27:36, 43:06, B63H5:125, 21:14) | [2019/07] | CPC: |
B63H5/125 (EP);
B63B35/003 (EP,KR);
B63B1/04 (EP);
B63B27/36 (EP);
B63B35/42 (EP);
B63B43/06 (EP,KR);
B63H21/14 (EP,KR);
B63H23/24 (EP);
B63H25/42 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2001/41] | B63B35/00, B63B35/42, B63H23/24, // (B63B1/04, 27:36, 43:06, B63H5:125, 21:14) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Title | German: | HALBEINTAUCHBARER SCHWERGUTFRACHTER | [2001/41] | English: | SEMI-IMMERSIBLE HEAVY-LIFT CARGOBOAT | [2001/41] | French: | CARGO POUR MARCHANDISES LOURDES SEMI-IMMERSIBLE | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 25.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.03.2004 | IE | 10.03.2004 | GR | 10.06.2004 | PT | 10.08.2004 | AT | 10.12.2004 | LU | 10.12.2004 | [2018/36] |
Former [2018/28] | CY | 10.03.2004 | |
ES | 10.03.2004 | ||
IE | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
PT | 10.08.2004 | ||
AT | 10.12.2004 | ||
LU | 10.12.2004 | ||
Former [2008/18] | CY | 10.03.2004 | |
IE | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
PT | 10.08.2004 | ||
AT | 10.12.2004 | ||
LU | 10.12.2004 | ||
Former [2007/23] | CY | 10.03.2004 | |
IE | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
AT | 10.12.2004 | ||
LU | 10.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/34] | IE | 10.03.2004 | |
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
AT | 10.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | IE | 10.03.2004 | |
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | GR | 10.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]AU482040B (TRIMARINER CORP) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 ** page 8, line 8 - line 23 *; | [A]EP0123704 (THIELE HEINRICH) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 6 *; | [A]US4678439 (SCHLICHTHORST NORBERT [DE]) [A] 9 * figure 1 * * column 6, line 52 - line 67 *; | [XP]DE29823737U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - TIMM W ET AL, "CONDOCK I - Neubau S 693 von Werft Nobiskrug GmbH", SCHIFF UND HAFEN., SEEHAFEN-VERLAG ERIK BLUMENFELD. HAMBURG., DE, (197911), vol. 31, no. 11, ISSN 0938-1643, pages 944 - 949, XP002135969 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - "AZIMUTHING ELECTRIC PROPULSION DRIVE", ABB ASEA BROWN BOVERI, ABB AZIPOD OY / ABB INDUSTRY OY, HELSINKI, FI, (19980512), pages 1 - 6, XP000783547 [Y] 1,3,5-15 * the whole document * | [YA] - "MULTI-PURPOSE ICEBREAKER 'BOTNICA' BOOSTED BY CAT-AZIPOD PROPULSION", MARINE ENGINEERS REVIEW,GB,INSTITUTE OF MARINE ENGINEERS. LONDON, (19980601), ISSN 0047-5955, pages 34 - 36, XP000765042 [Y] 2 * figure - * * page 34, column R, line 28 - page 35, column R, line 1 * [A] 1,3,5,9 | [YA] - GLOEL J ET AL, "EIN NEUES HOCHEFFIZIENTES ANTRIEBSSYSTEM", SCHIFF UND HAFEN,DE,SEEHAFEN-VERLAG ERIK BLUMENFELD. HAMBURG, (19971001), vol. 49, no. 10, ISSN 0938-1643, pages 40 - 42,44, XP000720093 [Y] 4 * the whole document * [A] 1,3 | [A] - HACKMAN T, "ELECTRIC PROPULSION SYSTEMS FOR SHIPS - A NEW 'POWER PLANT CONCEPT' GIVES A BOOST TO THE MARINE SECTOR", ABB REVIEW, ABB ASEA BROWN BOVERI, ZURICH, CH, (19920601), no. 3, ISSN 1013-3119, pages 3 - 12, XP000304699 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * | [A] - GALLOIS J; LANG J, "Schwerölbetrieb bei mittelschnellaufenden Tauchkolbenmotoren", JAHRBUCH DER SCHIFFBAUTECHNISCHEN GESELLSCHAFT 1965., BERLIN, DE, (1966), vol. 59, ISSN 0374-1222, pages 683 - 701, XP000904463 [A] 10 * page 697, line 7 - line 25 * |