EP1062168 - CHAIN ELEMENT FOR A CURVE-GOING CONVEYOR CHAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flexon Pirna GmbH Gewerbering 14 01809 Dohna / DE | [2000/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANZEN, Wolfgang Am Marienhain 2 D-57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | 02 /
NENDEL, Klaus Hauptstrasse 4 D-09569 Oederan / DE | 03 /
MIERUCH, Tino Unterer Gutsweg 8 D-09212 Limbach-Oberfrohna / DE | 04 /
MEYNERTS, Peter Dorfstrasse 129 D-09224 Grüna / DE | 05 /
SCHÖNBERG, Beata Fürstenstrasse 20 D-09130 Chemnitz / DE | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Langmaack, Jürgen Patentanwälte Maxton & Langmaack Postfach 51 08 06 50944 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Langmaack, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Maxton & Langmaack, Postfach 51 08 06 50944 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 99964517.9 | 02.12.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999EP09411 | Priority number, date | DE1998156908 | 10.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19856908 | [2000/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0034157 | Date: | 15.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1062168 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/00 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
B65G17/086 (EP);
B65G2201/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | KETTENELEMENT FÜR EINE KURVENGÄNGIGE FÖRDERKETTE | [2000/52] | English: | CHAIN ELEMENT FOR A CURVE-GOING CONVEYOR CHAIN | [2000/52] | French: | ELEMENT DE CHAINE POUR UNE CHAINE DE TRANSPORT SUIVANT UNE TRAJECTOIRE COURBE | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 25.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/34] | 13.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US5346060 (FERGUSON GREGORY A) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 26 - line 49 * * column 3, line 1 - line 10 * * column 4, line 32 - line 38; figures 1-3 * [A] 6 [Y] 1-5; | [YDA]DE2306973 (REXNORD INC) [YD] 1-5 * figures 3,4,7 * [A] 6; | [YA]US5027944 (DAMKJAER POUL E) [Y] 4 * column 1, line 42 - line 55 * * column 2, line 3 - line 10 * * column 3, line 20 - line 24; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-3,5,6; | [A]US3807548 (BERGERON M) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |