16.10.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
04.11.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
09.09.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] |
22.07.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] |
17.09.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] |
10.09.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.09.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.02.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.01.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.09.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.09.2003 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
02.07.2003 |
New entry: Examination report or reply |
|
09.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.03.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] |
17.01.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.12.2002 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] |
19.12.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.12.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.10.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.08.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] |
05.06.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.03.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.01.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.10.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.08.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.08.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.03.2001 |
First examination report |
|
27.03.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.01.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] |
21.10.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.12.2000 [2000/49] |
26.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.06.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.06.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|