EP1140718 - SODA-LIME GLASS WITH BLUE SHADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAVERBEL Chaussée de la Hulpe, 166 1170 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states GLAVERBEL Chaussée de la Hulpe, 166 B-1170 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOGUENNE, Marc Rue du Surtia, 28 B-5081 Saint-Denis / BE | 02 /
COSTER, Dominique Rue Bois de Boquet, 29 A B-5020 Temploux / BE | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Le Vaguerèse, Sylvain Jacques AGC France 114 Bureaux de la Colline 92213 Saint-Cloud Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Le Vaguerèse, Sylvain Glaverbel, Department Intellectual Property, Centre R. & D., Rue de l'Aurore, 2 6040 Jumet / BE | Application number, filing date | 99964559.1 | 13.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999EP09849 | Priority number, date | EP19980124371 | 22.12.1998 Original published format: EP 98124371 | [2001/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0037372 | Date: | 29.06.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1140718 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1140718 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/087, C03C3/095, C03C4/02, C03C4/08 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
C03C4/085 (EP,US);
C03C3/087 (EP,US);
C03C3/095 (EP,US);
C03C4/02 (EP,US);
C03C4/082 (EP,US);
Y10S501/904 (EP,US);
Y10S501/905 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Title | German: | NATRONKALKGLAS MIT BLAUSTICH | [2001/41] | English: | SODA-LIME GLASS WITH BLUE SHADE | [2001/41] | French: | VERRE SODO-CALCIQUE A NUANCE BLEUE | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 18.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.08.2003 | FI | 20.08.2003 | IE | 20.08.2003 | NL | 20.08.2003 | DK | 20.11.2003 | GR | 20.11.2003 | SE | 20.11.2003 | CY | 13.12.2003 | MC | 31.12.2003 | PT | 20.01.2004 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/36] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
IE | 20.08.2003 | ||
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
DK | 20.11.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
CY | 13.12.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
IE | 20.08.2003 | ||
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
DK | 20.11.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
IE | 20.08.2003 | ||
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
DK | 20.11.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 20.08.2003 | |
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 20.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0536049 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [X] 1,5,8,9 * examples 2,10; claim - *; | [A]US5411922 (JONES JAMES V [US]) [A] 1-13* examples 3,11; claim -; table 3 *; | [A]GB2304709 (GLAVERBEL [BE]) [A] 1-13 * claim - *; | [PX]EP0887320 (GLAVERBEL [BE]) [PX] 1-9,13 * examples 21-24,28; claim - * |