EP1146832 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RELEASING TOOTH POSITIONING APPLIANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Align Technology, Inc. 881 Martin Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | [2008/14] |
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states Align Technology, Inc. 442 Potrero Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHISHTI, Muhammad 970 Corte Madera Avenue No.302 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 02 /
PHAN, Loc, X. 31 Jacklin Circle Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/43] | 01 /
CHISHTI, Muhammad 970 Corte Madera Avenue No.302 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | ||
02 /
PHAN, Loc, X. 2042 19th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94116 / US | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2001/43] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99965043.5 | 23.11.1999 | [2001/43] | WO1999US28008 | Priority number, date | US19980110189P | 30.11.1998 Original published format: US 110189 P | US19990250962 | 16.02.1999 Original published format: US 250962 | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0032131 | Date: | 08.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1146832 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1146832 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.06.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61C7/08 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
A61C7/00 (EP,US);
A61C7/08 (EP,US);
A61C2201/007 (EP,US);
A61C7/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/43] | A61C3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM LÖSEN VON ZAHNPOSITIONIERUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2001/43] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RELEASING TOOTH POSITIONING APPLIANCES | [2001/43] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR ENLEVER UN DISPOSITIF DE REPOSITIONNEMENT DES DENTS | [2008/20] |
Former [2001/43] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE SEPARATION D'ARTICLES DE MISE EN PLACE DE DENTS | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2001 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08165311.5 / EP2002797 | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.11.2008 | BE | 12.11.2008 | CY | 12.11.2008 | DK | 12.11.2008 | FI | 12.11.2008 | IT | 12.11.2008 | NL | 12.11.2008 | IE | 23.11.2008 | LU | 23.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | SE | 12.02.2009 | GR | 13.02.2009 | ES | 23.02.2009 | PT | 13.04.2009 | [2014/32] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CY | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 23.11.2008 | ||
LU | 23.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CY | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 23.11.2008 | ||
LU | 23.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 23.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | ES | 23.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3848335 (BERGERSEN E) [X] 1,2,5 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 4 * * claims 1,2 *; | [DA]US4755139 (ABBATTE GERARD P [US], et al) [DA] 1,4,7,18,21,32 * column 4, lines 27-68 * * column 5, lines 33-50 ** column 7, lines 4-21 *; | [X]US5607300 (TEPPER HARRY W [US]) [X] 21,23,33-35 * column 6, lines 43-49 * * figure 11; claim 12 * | International search | [X]US3950851 (BERGERSEN EARL O); | [X]US4526540 (DELLINGER EUGENE L [US]); | [A]US4591341 (ANDREWS LAWRENCE F [US]); | [A]US4793803 (MARTZ MARTIN G [US]); | [A]US4983334 (ADELL LOREN S [US]); | [X]US5645421 (SLOOTSKY GARY LEE [US]) | by applicant | US3950851 | US4526540 | US4755139 | US4798534 | US4856991 | US5035613 | US5055039 | US5059118 | US5186623 | US5975893 | - KLEEMANN; JANSSEN, J. CLIN. ORTHODON., (1996), vol. 30, pages 673 - 680 | - CURETON, J. CLIN. ORTHODON., (1996), vol. 30, pages 390 - 395 | - CHIAPPONE, J. CLIN. ORTHODON., (1980), vol. 14, pages 121 - 133 | - SHILLIDAY, AM. J. ORTHODONTICS, (1971), vol. 59, pages 596 - 599 | - WELLS, AM. J. ORTHODONTICS, (1970), vol. 58, pages 351 - 366 | - COTTINGHAM, AM. J. ORTHODONTICS, (1969), vol. 55, pages 23 - 31 |