Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5966099 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE29813773 | 01.08.1998 | DE9902117 | 08.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1123032 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE29813773 | 01.08.1998 | DE9902117 | 08.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE29980112U | 23.08.2001 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE29980112 | 08.07.1999 | DE29813773 | 01.08.1998 | DE9902117 | 08.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0007489 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE29813773 | 01.08.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE29813773U | 05.11.1998 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE29813773 | 01.08.1998 |