EP1123032 - BASIN-SHAPED ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asem Industrieberatung und Vermittlung GmbH Im Hasseldamm 21 41352 Korschenbroich / DE | [2001/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEMMLER, Axel Kannenhofer Weg 100 D-41066 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Bonsmann, Manfred, et al Bonsmann & Bonsmann Patentanwälte Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35a 41063 Mönchengladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | Bonsmann, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing., et al Bonsmann & Bonsmann Patentanwälte, Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35a 41063 Mönchengladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 99965349.6 | 08.07.1999 | [2001/33] | WO1999DE02117 | Priority number, date | DE1998213773U | 01.08.1998 Original published format: DE 29813773 U | [2001/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0007489 | Date: | 17.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1123032 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/28, A47K3/02 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
A47K3/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2001/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALENFÖRMIGES ELEMENT | [2001/33] | English: | BASIN-SHAPED ELEMENT | [2001/33] | French: | ELEMENT EN FORME DE CUVETTE | [2001/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 29.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/32] | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.09.2002 | 31.07.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB2313306 (BELDORE LIMITED) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9 * page 3, line 12 - page 5, line 1; figure - * [A] 12; | [XA]EP0684004 (FASSBENDER GMBH) [X] 1,2,4,8 * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 23; figure 1 * [A] 9 |