EP1141238 - PRODUCTION OF PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISLAM, Seema, Glaxo Wellcome plc Langley Court, South Eden Park Road Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB | 02 /
SHARP, Nigel Alan, Glaxo Wellcome plc Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | [2004/40] |
Former [2001/41] | 01 /
ISLAM, Seema, Glaxo Welcome plc Langley Court, South Eden Park Road Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB | ||
02 /
SHARP, Nigel Alan, Glaxo Welcome plc Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | Representative(s) | Filler, Wendy Anne, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Filler, Wendy Anne, Dr., et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property Two New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99965506.1 | 21.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999EP10157 | Priority number, date | GB19980028624 | 23.12.1998 Original published format: GB 9828624 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0039282 | Date: | 06.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1141238 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1141238 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/38, C12N5/00, C12P21/02 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
C12N5/0018 (EP,US);
C12N1/38 (EP,US);
C12N2500/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON PROTEINEN | [2004/31] | English: | PRODUCTION OF PROTEINS | [2001/41] | French: | PRODUCTION DE PROTEINES | [2001/41] |
Former [2001/41] | HESTELLUNG VON PROTEINEN | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 21.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.02.2005 | CH | 02.02.2005 | FI | 02.02.2005 | LI | 02.02.2005 | NL | 02.02.2005 | DK | 02.05.2005 | GR | 02.05.2005 | SE | 02.05.2005 | PT | 02.07.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2006/22] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
NL | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
FI | 02.02.2005 | ||
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 02.02.2005 | |
SE | 02.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 02.02.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0239292 (CELLTECH LTD [GB]) [DA] * the whole document *; | [DA]WO8906686 (UPJOHN CO [US]) [DA] * the whole document *; | [DA]US5378612 (NAKASHIMA KAZUYUKI [JP], et al) [DA] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9639488 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A] - CHOTIGEAT W ET AL, "ROLE OF ENVIRONMENTAL CONDITIONS ON THE EXPRESSION LEVELS, GLYCOFORM PATTERN AND LEVELS OF SIALYLTRANSFERASE FOR HFSH PRODUCEDBY RECOMBINANT CHO CELLS", CYTOTECHNOLOGY,NL,KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, (19940101), vol. 15, no. 1/03, ISSN 0920-9069, pages 217 - 221, XP000602299 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00762396 | [A] - D.P. PALERMO ET AL., "Production of analytical quantities of recombinant proteins in Chinese hamster overy cells using sodium butyrate to elevate gene expression", J. BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM,NL, (199106), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 35 - 48, XP002135791 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1656(91)90073-5 | [A] - GOLDSTEIN S ET AL, "ENHANCED TRANSFECTION EFFICIENCY AND IMPROVED CELL SURVIVAL AFTER ELECTROPORATION OF G2/M-SYNCHRONIZED CELLS AND TREATMENT WITH SODIUM BUTYRATE", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH,GB,OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, (19890101), vol. 17, no. 10, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 3959 - 3971, XP002054817 [A] * the whole document * | [DA] - GORMAN C M ET AL, "EXPRESSION OF RECOMBINANT PLASMIDS IN MAMMALIAN CELLS IS ENHANCED BY SODIUM BUTYRATE", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH,GB,OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, (19830101), vol. 11, no. 21, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 7631 - 7648, XP002054816 [DA] * the whole document * | [DA] - C.R. BEBBINGTON ET AL., "High-level expression of a recombinant antibody from myeloma cells using a glutamine synthetase gene as an amplifiable selectable marker", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBL. CO.,NEW YORK, US, (199202), vol. 10, pages 169 - 175, XP002135792 [DA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0292-169 |