|
01.07.2009 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2008 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.07.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.07.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.07.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.06.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.06.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.06.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.06.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.06.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.06.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
12.06.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2007 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2007 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2007 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.07.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.07.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2002 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.07.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
37 |