03.07.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] |
25.07.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
04.07.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.07.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.02.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.06.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.04.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.03.2007 |
First examination report |
|
09.02.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.02.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.12.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.08.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.08.2006 |
First examination report |
|
28.07.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.03.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.04.2004 |
Change - designated states |
published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |
19.12.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.12.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.04.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
09.01.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.08.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] |
24.08.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] |
14.08.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|