Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4549536B | Global Dossier | 22.09.2010 | B2 | JP2002534144 | 15.10.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9902365 | 15.12.1999 | SE9804616 | 30.12.1998 | US11479999 | 04.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU761527B | Global Dossier | 05.06.2003 | B2 | AU2134500 | 24.07.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9902365 | 15.12.1999 | SE9804616 | 30.12.1998 | US11479999 | 04.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1139855 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2008 | B1 | EP1139855 | 10.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9902365 | 15.12.1999 | SE9804616 | 30.12.1998 | US11479999 | 04.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69939436D1 | 09.10.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | SE9902365 | 15.12.1999 | SE9804616 | 30.12.1998 | US11479999 | 04.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE520062 | 20.05.2003 | C2 | SE9804616L | 01.07.2000 | L | SE9804616D0 | 30.12.1998 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE9804616 | 30.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6527391 | 04.03.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | SE9902365 | 15.12.1999 | SE9804616 | 30.12.1998 | US11479999 | 04.01.1999 | US86949501 | 08.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0040140 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9804616 | 30.12.1998 | US11479999 | 04.01.1999 |