EP1140327 - LIQUID UREA EXHAUST GAS TREATMENT ADDITIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Oil Corporation 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax, VA 22037 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax, VI 22037-0001 / US | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax, Virginia 22037-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSSER, Richard, W. 6 Macclesfield Drive Medford, NJ 08055 / US | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Dew, Melvyn John, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Dew, Melvyn John, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. Law Technology P.O.Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 99965882.6 | 23.11.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999US27819 | Priority number, date | US19980109428P | 23.11.1998 Original published format: US 109428 P | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0030733 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1140327 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.06.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, F01N3/20 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP);
B01D53/56 (EP);
B01D53/9409 (EP);
B01J12/007 (EP);
F01N2610/02 (EP);
F23J2215/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGER HARNSTOFFZUSATZ ZUR ABGASBEHANDLUNG | [2001/41] | English: | LIQUID UREA EXHAUST GAS TREATMENT ADDITIVE | [2001/41] | French: | ADDITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT LIQUIDE A BASE D'UREE | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 17.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/19] | 05.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9843732 (CLEAN DIESEL TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * page 1, lines 11-13; claim 1 *; | [X]US4325924 (ARAND JOHN K, et al) [X] 1-3,5,7 * the whole document * | International search | [XP]US5976475 (PETER-HOBLYN JEREMY D [GB], et al); | [Y]US4780289 (EPPERLY WILLIAM R [US], et al); | [A]US4626417 (YOUNG DONALD C [US]) |