EP1142040 - ACTUATOR FOR DISPLACING A FINAL CONTROL ELEMENT AND FUEL INJECTION VALVE WITH AN ACTUATOR OF THIS TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUGUSTIN, Ulrich Schillerstrasse 25/1 D-71394 Kernen / DE | 02 /
FRANK, Wilhelm Meinhardtstrasse 44 D-96049 Bamberg / DE | 03 /
KLÜGL, Wendelin Föhrenstrasse 1 D-92358 Seubersdorf / DE | 04 /
LEWENTZ, Günter Lärchenweg 5 D-93055 Regensburg / DE | 05 /
FREUDENBERG, Helmut Mühlweg 13 A D-93080 Grossberg / DE | 06 /
SCHMUTZLER, Gerd Blütenstrasse 28 D-93138 Kareth / DE | [2001/41] | Application number, filing date | 99966862.7 | 14.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999DE03986 | Priority number, date | DE1998157922 | 15.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19857922 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0036658 | Date: | 22.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1142040 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1142040 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/09 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
H02N2/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/20] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | AKTOR ZUM AUSLENKEN EINES STELLGLIEDS UND KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL MIT EINEM SOLCHEN AKTOR | [2001/41] | English: | ACTUATOR FOR DISPLACING A FINAL CONTROL ELEMENT AND FUEL INJECTION VALVE WITH AN ACTUATOR OF THIS TYPE | [2001/41] | French: | ACTIONNEUR DESTINE A DEVIER UN ORGANE FINAL ET SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT DOTEE D'UN TEL ACTIONNEUR | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 05.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS62283274 ; | [X]EP0143128 (MOLONEY PAUL JULIAN) | by applicant | US4101076 |