EP1153475 - GATE BIASING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2007/02] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERICSSON, Per Skvadronsbacken 62 S-174 56 Sundbyberg / SE | 02 /
AFEKENSTAM, Nils Polhemsgatan 4 S-171 58 Solna / SE | 03 /
JOHANSSON, Jan Räntmästarvägen 20 S-194 54 Upplands Väsby / SE | 04 /
SJÖDEN, Henrik 151 52 Lassen Way Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Fritzon, Rolf Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Fritzon, Rolf Kransell & Wennborg AB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/46] | Hedberg, Sten Torsten Ericsson Microelectronics AB 164 81 Kista-Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 99967050.8 | 30.12.1999 | [2001/46] | WO1999SE02504 | Priority number, date | SE19990000210 | 25.01.1999 Original published format: SE 9900210 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0044089 | Date: | 27.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1153475 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1153475 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/30 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
H03F1/301 (EP,US);
H03K17/14 (KR);
H03F2200/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | GATE-VORSPANNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2001/46] | English: | GATE BIASING ARRANGEMENT | [2001/46] | French: | ENSEMBLE POLARISATION DE LA GRILLE | [2001/46] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 27.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 30.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 10.01.2007 | IT | 10.01.2007 | NL | 10.01.2007 | SE | 10.04.2007 | ES | 21.04.2007 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/18] | FI | 10.01.2007 | |
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SE | 10.04.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0606094 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]US4473762 (IWAHASHI HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5808496 (THIEL FRANK L [US]) |