EP1140941 - NITROGEN CONTAINING HETEROBICYCLES AS FACTOR XA INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Pharma Company P.O. Box 4000 Princeton NJ 08543-4000 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Pharma Company PO Box 4000 Princeton, New Jersey 08443-4000 / US | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Du Pont Pharmaceuticals Company Chestnut Run Plaza, 974 Centre Road Wilmington, DE 19807 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEVIG, John, M. 987 Church Road Lincoln University, PA 19352 / US | 02 /
CACCIOLA, Joseph 105 Pattie Drive Newark, DE 19702 / US | 03 /
CLARK, Charles, G. 4 Glenview Place Cherry Hill, NJ 08034 / US | 04 /
LAM, Patrick, Yuk, Sun 6 Ridgeway Drive Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US | 05 /
PINTO, Donald, J., P. 425 Brentford Road, Kennett Square PA 19348 / US | 06 /
PRUITT, James, R. 237 Skycrest Drive Landenberg, PA 19350 / US | 07 /
ROSSI, Karen, A. 3681 Marian Drive, Boothwyn PA 19061 / US | [2001/43] |
Former [2001/41] | 01 /
FEVIG, John, M. 987 Church Road Lincoln University, PA 19352 / US | ||
02 /
CACCIOLA, Joseph 105 Pattie Drive Newark, DE 19702 / US | |||
03 /
CLARK, Charles, G. 4 Glenview Place Cherry Hill, NJ 08034 / US | |||
04 /
LAM, Patrick, Yuk, Sun 6 Ridgeway Drive Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US | |||
05 /
PINTO, Donald, J., P. 39 Whitson Drive Newark, DE 19702 / US | |||
06 /
PRUITT, James, R. 237 Skycrest Drive Landenberg, PA 19350 / US | |||
07 /
ROSSI, Karen, A. 120A Embery Court Newark, DE 19711 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2003/17] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2001/41] | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99967444.3 | 17.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999US30316 | Priority number, date | US19980113628P | 23.12.1998 Original published format: US 113628 P | US19990127633P | 02.04.1999 Original published format: US 127633 P | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0039131 | Date: | 06.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1140941 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1140941 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D471/04, A61K31/415, A61K31/44, A61K31/505, A61K31/55, A61P7/02, // (C07D487/04, 231:00), C07D239:00,(C07D487/04, 231:00), C07D237:00,(C07D487/04, 223:00), C07D231:00,(C07D471/04, 211:00), C07D231:00 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 23.05.2001 | LV | 23.05.2001 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 23.05.2001 | SI | 23.05.2001 | Title | German: | STICKSTOFFHALTIGE HETEROBICYCLEN ALS FAKTOR-XA-HEMMER | [2001/41] | English: | NITROGEN CONTAINING HETEROBICYCLES AS FACTOR XA INHIBITORS | [2001/41] | French: | HETEROBICYCLIQUES CONTENANT DE L'AZOTE UTILISES COMME INHIBITEURS DU FACTEUR XA | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 27.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5721388 ; | [A]JPS63145282 ; | [DA]US3340269 (MORTON BLATTER HERBERT) [DA] 1-13 * claims 1-4 *; | [DA]US3365459 (MORTON BLATTER HERBERT) [DA] 1-13 * claims 1-22 *; | [A]US3423414 (BLATTER HERBERT MORTON) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-7 *; | [A]US3939161 (RATAJCZYK JAMES DANIEL, et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-8 *; | [A]WO9501980 (PFIZER [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-8 *; | [DA]WO9612720 (PFIZER [US], et al) [DA] 1-13 * claims 1-6 *; | [A]EP0807633 (PFIZER [US]) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-36 *; | [DA]WO9852948 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [DA] 1-13* claims 1-22 *; | [PA]WO9950255 (DU PONT PHARM CO [US]) [PA] 1-13 * claims 1-17 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820527), vol. 006, no. 090, & JP57021388 A 19820204 (NIPPON NOHYAKU CO., LTD.) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881026), vol. 012, no. 405, & JP63145282 A 19880617 (TAIYO YAKUHIN KOGYO K. K.) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |