EP1119252 - USE OF MELANIN FOR INHIBITION OF ANGIOGENESIS AND MACULAR DEGENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Children's Medical Center Corporation 300 Longwood Avenue Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US | [2001/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'AMATO, Robert, J. 65 Huron Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 99967818.8 | 20.08.1999 | [2001/31] | WO1999US19026 | Priority number, date | US19980097385P | 21.08.1998 Original published format: US 97385 P | [2001/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0010507 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1119252 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.05.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/404, A61P27/02 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/65 (EP,US);
A61K31/775 (EP,US);
A61K31/787 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C08F2/32 (EP,US);
C08F20/28 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/31] | A01N37/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON MELANIN ZUR HEMMUNG DER ANGIOGENESE UND MAKULÄREN DEGENERATION | [2001/31] | English: | USE OF MELANIN FOR INHIBITION OF ANGIOGENESIS AND MACULAR DEGENERATION | [2001/31] | French: | UTILISATION DE MELANINE POUR INHIBER L'ANGIOGENESE ET LA DEGENERESCENCE MACULAIRE | [2001/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 18.05.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T]WO9857647 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US], et al) [T] 5-8 * claim 3 and 5 * | [X] - KAMEI HIDEO ET AL, "Effect of allomelanin on tumor growth suppression in vivo and on the cell cycle phase", CANCER BIOTHERAPY AND RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, (199708), vol. 12, no. 4, ISSN 1084-9785, pages 273 - 276, XP009023397 [X] 1-3 * figure 1 * | [X] - WONG K T ET AL, "A cytotoxic melanin precursor, 5,6-dihydroxyindole, from the folkloric anti-cancer plant Rhaphidophora korthalsii", NATURAL PRODUCT LETTERS 1996 UNITED KINGDOM, (1996), vol. 9, no. 2, ISSN 1057-5634, pages 137 - 140, XP009023406 [X] 1-3 * page 137-138, paragraph entitled "Results and Discussion" * | [A] - SARNA T, "PROPERTIES AND FUNCTION OF THE OCULAR MELANIN - A PHOTOBIOPHYSICAL VIEW", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY B: BIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE S.A., BASEL, CH, (1992), vol. 12, no. 3, ISSN 1011-1344, pages 215 - 258, XP009012746 [A] 1-4 * page 248-249, paragraph entitled "7. Conclusions" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1011-1344(92)85027-R | [T] - BEK EUGENE L ET AL, "Endothelins are angiogenic", JOURNAL OF CARDIOVASCULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (2000), vol. 36, no. 5 Supplement 1, ISSN 0160-2446, pages S135 - S139, XP009023421 [T] 5-8 * page S136, left-hand column, first full paragraph; table 2 * | International search | [XP] - BOHM ET AL., "Alpha-melanocyte-stimulating hormone modulates activation of NG-kappa B and AP-1 and secretion of interleukin-8", SCISEARCH, UNIV. MUNSTER, DEPT. DERMATOL. (MUNSTER, GERMANY), Database accession no. 2000:14320, XP002941220 | [ ] - ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (199912), vol. 885, pages 277 - 286 |