EP1135126 - MYT1 KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham Corporation One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAGO, Maria, A. 701 Pondview Drive Audubon, PA 19403 / US | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Waters, David Martin GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Waters, David Martin GlaxoSmithKline, Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons, Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99968070.5 | 07.12.1999 | [2001/39] | WO1999US28700 | Priority number, date | US19980111183P | 07.12.1998 Original published format: US 111183 P | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0033837 | Date: | 15.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1135126 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/425 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
A61K31/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/39] | Title | German: | MYT1 KINASE INHIBITOREN | [2001/39] | English: | MYT1 KINASE INHIBITORS | [2001/39] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE LA KINASE MYT1 | [2001/39] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2001 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 06.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/49] | 26.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | JP2000016984 [ ] (PFIZER); | [A]US4946855 (YOSHINAGA JUNJI [JP], et al) | [XP] - MAW ET AL., "Preparation of benzylpiperazine derivatives as delta opioid receptor agonists", CAPLUS, Database accession no. 132:93337 |