Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004500760 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US9929890 | 15.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002243554 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US74265200 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1216855 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2003 | A3 | EP1216855 | 26.06.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US74265200 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2480500 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9929890 | 15.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1192055 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2003 | B1 | EP1192055 | 03.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9929890 | 15.12.1999 | US13445599 | 17.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0105998 | 06.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US74265200 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9917308 | 19.02.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9929890 | 15.12.1999 | US13445599 | 17.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69908661T | 29.04.2004 | T2 | DE69908661D1 | 10.07.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9929890 | 15.12.1999 | US13445599 | 17.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6369712 | 09.04.2002 | B2 | US2001004236 | 21.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9929890 | 15.12.1999 | US13445599 | 17.05.1999 | US74265200 | 21.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6995672 | 07.02.2006 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US9929890 | 15.12.1999 | US13445599 | 17.05.1999 | US4972401 | 07.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0144000 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2001 | A8 | WO0144000 | 21.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13445599 | 17.05.1999 |