EP1192055 - RF TRANSPONDER COMPRISING A RELAXATION OSCILLATOR AND METHOD OF GENERATING AN OSCILLATING MEASUREMENT SIGNAL IN AN RF TRANSPONDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/14] | RELAXATION OSCILLATOR FOR TRANSPONDER | ||
[2002/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YONES, Dale, Lee Apartment 133, 5610 Arapahoe Road Boulder, CO 80303 / US | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | ||
Former [2002/14] | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center, Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 99968126.5 | 15.12.1999 | [2002/14] | WO1999US29890 | Priority number, date | US19990134455P | 17.05.1999 Original published format: US 134455 P | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0144000 | Date: | 21.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1192055 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1192055 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04, H04B1/59, G08C17/02, H04Q9/00 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
B60C23/20 (EP);
B60C23/0413 (EP);
B60C23/0447 (EP);
B60C23/0462 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/14] | B60C23/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/23] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RF-TRANSPONDER MIT EINEM RELAXATIONSOSZILLATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES OSZILLIERENDEN MESSSIGNALS IN EINEM RF-TRANSPONDER | [2002/50] | English: | RF TRANSPONDER COMPRISING A RELAXATION OSCILLATOR AND METHOD OF GENERATING AN OSCILLATING MEASUREMENT SIGNAL IN AN RF TRANSPONDER | [2002/50] | French: | TRANSPONDEUR RF COMPRENNANT UN OSCILLATEUR A RELAXATION ET PROCEDE D'ENGENDRER UN SIGNAL DE MESURE OSCILLANT DANS UN TRANSPONDEUR RF | [2002/50] |
Former [2002/14] | RELAXATIONSOSZILLATOR FÜR TRANSPONDER | ||
Former [2002/14] | RELAXATION OSCILLATOR FOR TRANSPONDER | ||
Former [2002/14] | OSCILLATEUR A RELAXATION DESTINE A UN TRANSPONDEUR | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 27.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9952723 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US], et al) [A] 1,12,21 * page 27, line 24 - page 28, line 21; figure 3 * * page 25, line 12 - page 26, line 25 * | by applicant | US5368082 | US4578992 | US5540092 | US5451959 | US5661651 | US5581023 | US5562787 | US5731754 | US3893228 | US4317216 | US5528452 | US5706565 | WO0002028 | US3596509 | US4335283 | US4126772 | US4909074 | US5050110 | US5230243 | US4966034 | US5140851 | US4567459 | US4893110 | US4703650 | US4174515 | US5285189 | US5297424 | US5231872 | US4695823 | US5228337 | US5054315 | WO9952723 |