EP1242554 - HEAT ACTIVATED ADHESIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWATE, Kohichiro 3-8-17, Tamagawa-gakuen Machida-city, Tokyo 194-0041 / JP | 02 /
TAKAMATSU, Yorinobu 11-7, Kamimizo 3-chome, Sagamihara-city Kanagawa Pref., 229-0031 / JP | 03 /
YAMAGUCHI, Hitoshi 2-46-4-101, Bessho Hachiouji-shi, Tokyo 192-0363 / JP | 04 /
MURAMATSU, Akito 4-22-3, Kaminoge, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0093 / JP | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/39] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99968455.8 | 05.11.1999 | [2002/39] | WO1999US26195 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0134716 | Date: | 17.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1242554 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1242554 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02, C09J201/06, C09J133/14 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
C08F220/301 (EP);
C09J133/066 (US);
C08F220/302 (EP);
C08L67/00 (KR);
C09J11/08 (KR);
C09J133/08 (KR);
C09J133/14 (EP);
C09J201/06 (EP);
C09J7/10 (EP,US);
C08L2666/14 (EP);
C08L67/04 (EP);
C09J2301/304 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08F220/301, C08F220/302 (EP);
C09J133/14, C08L67/04 (EP);
C09J201/06, C08L2666/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2004/21] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HITZEAKTIVIERBARER KLEBSTOFF | [2002/39] | English: | HEAT ACTIVATED ADHESIVE | [2002/39] | French: | ADHESIF THERMOCOLLANT | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 25.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 04.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3576778 (DAVIS IRWIN J) [Y] 1-3 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 52 *; | [Y]US5192612 (OTTER JAMES W [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 3, line 58 - column 5, line 19 *; | [Y]US5883193 (KARIM NAIMUL [US]) [Y] 1-3 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 10 * * column 6, line 53 - line 67 *; | [E]JP2000119624 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) [E] 1-3* see the whole document * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 32, Database accession no. 369642 [ ] * abstract * |