28.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
03.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] |
06.01.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] |
30.09.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
14.01.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] |
07.01.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.12.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.07.2004 |
Change - inventor |
published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] |
21.07.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.07.2004 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
10.07.2004 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
11.06.2004 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] |
11.06.2004 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] |
28.01.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.01.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.10.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] |
19.09.2003 |
First examination report |
|
17.09.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.01.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.04.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
16.01.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.08.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] |
24.08.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] |
06.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|