blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1141294

EP1141294 - METHOD OF ENHANCING THE BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY OF LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, SE
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
REGENERON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
777 Old Saw Mill River Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591-6707 / US
[2001/41]
Inventor(s)01 / DAVIS, Samuel, J.
332 W. 88th Street, B2
New York, NY 10024 / US
02 / GALE, Nicholas, W.
Apartment 46V, 177 White Plains Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
03 / YANCOPOULOS, George, D.
1519 Baptist Church Road
Yorktown Heigths, NY 10598 / US
04 / STAHL, Neil
RD 10, Kent Shore Drive
Carmel, NY 10512 / US
 [2004/37]
Former [2001/41]01 / DAVIS, Samuel
332 W. 88th Street, B2
New York, NY 10024 / US
02 / GALE, Nicholas, W.
Apartment 46V, 177 White Plains Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US
03 / YANCOPOULOS, George, D.
1519 Baptist Church Road
Yorktown Heigths, NY 10598 / US
04 / STAHL, Neil
RD 10, Kent Shore Drive
Carmel, NY 10512 / US
Representative(s)Duckworth, Timothy John
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/51]Duckworth, Timothy John
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2001/41]Goldin, Douglas Michael
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date99968956.523.12.1999
[2001/41]
WO1999US30900
Priority number, dateUS19980113387P23.12.1998         Original published format: US 113387 P
[2001/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0037642
Date:29.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1141294
Date:10.10.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1141294
Date:02.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.06.2000
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/62, C12N5/10, C07K14/515, C07K14/52
[2004/31]
CPC:
C07K14/515 (EP,US); A61P25/28 (EP); C07K14/52 (EP,US);
C12N15/62 (EP,US); A61K38/00 (EP,US); C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US); C07K2319/30 (EP,US); C07K2319/73 (EP,US);
C07K2319/75 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2001/41]C12N15/12, C12N15/62, C12N5/10, C12N1/21, C07K14/515, C07K14/52
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/41]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:METHODE ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG DER BIOLOGISCHEN AKTIVITÄT VON LIGANDEN[2001/41]
English:METHOD OF ENHANCING THE BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY OF LIGANDS[2001/41]
French:TECHNIQUE PERMETTANT D'ACCROITRE L'ACTIVITE BIOLOGIQUE DE LIGANDS[2001/41]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2001National basic fee paid 
27.06.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/41]
19.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2004Fee for grant paid
19.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI02.03.2005
IT02.03.2005
DK02.06.2005
GR02.06.2005
SE02.06.2005
ES13.06.2005
PT03.08.2005
[2008/18]
Former [2006/14]FI02.03.2005
DK02.06.2005
GR02.06.2005
ES13.06.2005
PT03.08.2005
Former [2006/12]FI02.03.2005
DK02.06.2005
ES13.06.2005
Former [2005/46]FI02.03.2005
Cited inInternational search[XAY]WO9203569  (SANGSTAT MEDICAL CORP [US]) [X] 23-26,29,32-41 * abstract * * page 1 - page 3 * * page 19, line 14 - line 23 * [A] 27,28 [Y] 30;
 [YD]WO9527060  (REGENERON PHARMA [US]) [YD] 8-11,30 * abstract * * page 23, line 21 - page 24, line 8 * * claims 4,8 *;
 [XAY]WO9637621  (MORPHOSYS PROTEINOPTIMIERUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,12-22 * abstract * * page 1, line 12 - line 15 * * page 2, line 4 - line 9 * * page 14, line 6 - line 11 * * page 16, line 29 - line 34 * * figure 1A * [A] 6,7 [Y] 8-11;
 [A]EP0816510  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 1-22 * abstract *;
 [AD]  - DAVIS S. ET AL., "Isolation of Angiopoietin-1, a ligand for the TIE2 receptor, by secretion-trap expression cloning", CELL, (19961227), vol. 87, pages 1161 - 1169, XP002138354 [AD] 6,7,27,28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(00)81812-7
 [AD]  - MAISONPIERRE P.C. ET AL., "Angiopoietin-2, a natural antagonist for Tie2 that disrupts in vivo angiogenesis.", SCIENCE, (19970704), vol. 277, pages 55 - 60, XP002138355 [AD] 6,7,27,28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.277.5322.55
 [A]  - TOURNAY C. ET AL., "Uptake of recombinant myeloperoxidase, free or fused to Fc-gamma, by macrophages enhances killing activity towards micro-organisms", DNA CELL BIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 15, no. 8, pages 617 - 624, XP000907279 [A] 21,40 * abstract * * page 618 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.