EP1153151 - DIE CAST SUPERALLOY ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION 1 Financial Plaza Hartford Connecticut 06101 / US | ||
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, Connecticut 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHIRRA, John, Joseph 126 Windermere Lane Ellington, CT 06029 / US | 02 /
BORG, Christopher, Anthony 25 Fairlee Road West Hartford, CT 06107 / US | 03 /
HATALA, Robert, William 720 Foster Road South Windsor, CT 06074 / US | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99968962.3 | 22.12.1999 | [2001/46] | WO1999US31000 | Priority number, date | US19980113567P | 23.12.1998 Original published format: US 113567 P | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0037695 | Date: | 29.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1153151 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1153151 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.06.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C22C19/07, C22C19/05, C22C1/02 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
C22F1/10 (EP);
C22C19/05 (KR);
C22C19/055 (EP);
C22C19/056 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/46] | C22C19/07, C22C19/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUPERLEGIERUNGSDRUCKGUSSTEILE | [2001/46] | English: | DIE CAST SUPERALLOY ARTICLES | [2001/46] | French: | PIECES MOULEES SOUS PRESSION EN SUPERALLIAGE | [2001/46] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2001 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.07.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 05.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Request for further processing for: | 23.12.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2007 | BE | 21.02.2007 | CH | 21.02.2007 | CY | 21.02.2007 | DK | 21.02.2007 | FI | 21.02.2007 | IT | 21.02.2007 | LI | 21.02.2007 | NL | 21.02.2007 | SE | 21.05.2007 | GR | 22.05.2007 | ES | 01.06.2007 | PT | 23.07.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/23] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IT | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5316663 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD) [X] 1-23 * abstract *; | [X]US4284124 (KOMATSU MIKIYA, et al) [X] 1-23 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 19 * * column 7, lines 37-40 *; | [X]US4512383 (SUZUKI SHUNSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-23 * column 8, line 50 - line 53; table 1 *; | [X] - MA ET AL, "Investigation of microstructure of fine grain cast IN718 compressor blade from abroad", STN CAPLUS, XX, XX, (19980323), vol. 128, no. 12, XP002136723 [X] 1-23 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US4437913 (FUKUI YUTAKA [JP], et al); | [Y]US5120373 (MILLER JOHN A [US], et al); | [Y]US5130087 (HENRY MICHAEL F [US]); | [A]US5154884 (WUKUSICK CARL S [US], et al); | [A]US5182080 (BELTRAN ADRIAN M [US], et al); | [Y]US5399313 (ROSS EARL W [US], et al); | [AP]US5897718 (HESSELL STEVEN J [GB], et al); | [YP]US5938863 (MALLEY DAVID R [US]) |