EP1115659 - METHODS TO PARTIALLY REDUCE CERTAIN METAL OXIDES AND OXYGEN REDUCED METAL OXIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane, Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIFE, James, A. 1352 Inverness Court Myrtle Beach, SC 29575 / US | [2001/32] |
Former [2001/29] | 01 /
FIFE, James, A. Apartment H 642 East Flint Lake Court Myrtle Beach, SC 29579 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99969076.1 | 16.09.1999 | [2001/29] | WO1999US21413 | Priority number, date | US19980100629P | 16.09.1998 Original published format: US 100629 P | [2001/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0015556 | Date: | 23.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1115659 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C01G1/02 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
H01G9/042 (EP,KR,US);
C01G35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C01G1/02 (EP,US);
C01G33/00 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/495 (EP,US);
H01G9/0525 (EP,US);
C01F7/02 (KR);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/20 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (KR);
C01P2006/10 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2006/14 (EP,US);
C01P2006/16 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TEILWEISEN REDUKTION VON BESTIMMTEN METALLOXIDEN SOWIE METALLOXIDE MIT VERRINGERTEM SAUERSTOFFANTEIL | [2001/29] | English: | METHODS TO PARTIALLY REDUCE CERTAIN METAL OXIDES AND OXYGEN REDUCED METAL OXIDES | [2001/29] | French: | PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE PARTIELLEMENT CERTAINS OXYDES METALLIQUES ET OXYDES METALLIQUES REDUITS PAR L'OXYGENE | [2001/29] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 16.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/02] | 23.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2001 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4201798 (LINDMAYER JOSEPH [US]) [X] 15-17,19,21-23,25 * column 3, line 40 - line 45 * * column 4, line 15 - line 20 * [Y] 38,39; | [YD]US5412533 (MURAYAMA TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [YD] 38,39* column W *; | [YP]US5825611 (POZDEEV YURI L [IL]) [YP] 38,39 * column W * |