EP1031123 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATIC EVENT DETECTION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2005/27] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEGAL, Michael, L. 1442 Turquoise Drive Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 02 /
ANTONIO, Franklin, P. 2765 Cordoba Cove Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 03 /
ELAM, Sue 3634 Alabama Street San Diego, CA 92104 / US | 04 /
ERLENBACH, Judd 10673 Canyon Lake Drive San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 05 /
WOOTEN, Kathleen, R. 11276 Caminito Rodar San Diego, CA 92126 / US | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Walsh, Michael Joseph Tomkins & Co. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | Walsh, Michael Joseph TOMKINS & CO. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 99969171.0 | 15.09.1999 | [2000/35] | WO1999US21420 | Priority number, date | US19980153732 | 15.09.1998 Original published format: US 153732 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0016293 | Date: | 23.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1031123 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1031123 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/127 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
G08G1/20 (EP,BR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/35] | Extension states | AL | 15.05.2000 | LT | 15.05.2000 | LV | 15.05.2000 | MK | 15.05.2000 | RO | 15.05.2000 | SI | 15.05.2000 | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE EREIGNISDETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND - VERFAHREN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN NACHRICHTENÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | [2000/35] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATIC EVENT DETECTION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2000/35] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE DETECTER AUTOMATIQUEMENT UN EVENEMENT DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2000/35] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 17.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 12.12.2005 | [2006/14] | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0488594 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * column 3, lines 28-32 * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 3 *; | [A]WO9429827 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-7 * page 5, lines 10-21 * * page 6, lines 13-15 ** page 10, lines 3-28 *; | [Y]EP0708427 (TECNOST MAEL SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 21 * * column 6, lines 22-33 * * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 56 * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO9636930 (MOBILE INFORMATION SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 6,7 * page 9, lines 5-13 * * page 16, line 33 - page 17, line 7 * * figure 7 *; | [X]DE19633525 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,6 * column 1, lines 38-64 * * column 3, lines 51-67 *; | [A]US5754125 (PEARCE JOHN NICHOLAS [GB]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, lines 53-65 * | by applicant | US4928274 | US4979170 | US5017926 |