EP1139973 - POLYMERISABLE MATERIALS WHICH ARE BASED ON HARDENABLE SILOXANE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M ESPE AG Espe Platz 82229 Seefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states 3M Espe AG Espe Platz 82229 Seefeld / DE | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states ESPE Dental AG Espe Platz 82229 Seefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEINMANN, Wolfgang Frauwiesenweg 3 D-82205 Gilching / DE | 02 /
ZECH, Joachim Hauptstrasse 36a D-82229 Seefeld / DE | 03 /
GASSER, Oswald Höhenstrasse 10 D-82229 Seefeld / DE | 04 /
GUGGENBERGER, Rainer Kienbachstrasse 26b D-82211 Herrsching / DE | 05 /
ECKHARDT, Gunther OdF-strasse 22 D-06231 Bad Dürrenberg / DE | 06 /
BISSINGER, Peter Vorhölzerstrasse 10 D-86911 Diessen / DE | 07 /
SOGLOWEK, Wolfgang Bergstrasse 30 D-86911 Die en-Obermühlhausen / DE | [2001/42] |
Former [2001/41] | 01 /
WEINMANN, Wolfgang Frauwiesenweg 3 D-82205 Gilching / DE | ||
02 /
ZECH, Joachim Hauptstrasse 36a D-82229 Seefeld / DE | |||
03 /
GASSER, Oswald Höhenstrasse 10 D-82229 Seefeld / DE | |||
04 /
GUGGENBERGER, Rainer Kienbachstrasse 26b D-82211 Herrsching / DE | |||
05 /
ECKHARDT, Gunther Hurtenstrasse 8 D-82346 Frieding / DE | |||
06 /
BISSINGER, Peter Liftenweg 1 D-82297 Steindorf / DE | |||
07 /
SOGLOWEK, Wolfgang Bergstrasse 30 D-86911 Die en-Obermühlhausen / DE | Representative(s) | Freiherr von Wittgenstein, Arved, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Freiherr von Wittgenstein, Arved, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99969226.2 | 22.12.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999EP10319 | Priority number, date | DE1998160364 | 24.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19860364 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0038619 | Date: | 06.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1139973 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1139973 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/21, A61K6/093 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
C07F7/21 (EP,US);
A61K6/887 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/887, C08L51/085 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/41] | A61K6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Title | German: | POLYMERISIERBARE MASSEN AUF DER BASIS VON ZUR AUSHÄRTUNG BEFÄHIGTEN SILOXANVERBINDUNGEN | [2001/41] | English: | POLYMERISABLE MATERIALS WHICH ARE BASED ON HARDENABLE SILOXANE COMPOUNDS | [2001/41] | French: | MATIERES POLYMERISABLES A BASE DE COMPOSES DE SILOXANE DURCISSABLES | [2001/41] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2003/17: Derzeit sind die WIPO-Publikationsdaten A3 nicht verfügbar. | EPB 2003/17: WIPO A3 publication data is not currently available. | EPB 2003/17: L'OMPI données de publication A3 ne sont pas actuellement disponibles. | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 27.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 23.04.2003 | IE | 23.04.2003 | NL | 23.04.2003 | DK | 23.07.2003 | GR | 23.07.2003 | PT | 23.07.2003 | SE | 23.07.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | CY | 22.12.2003 | LU | 22.12.2003 | BE | 31.12.2003 | MC | 31.12.2003 | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/23] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 22.12.2003 | ||
LU | 22.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 22.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/01] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 22.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
CY | 22.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | NL | 23.04.2003 | |
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 23.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2023628 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG); | [X]GB2086914 (G C SHIKA KOGYA KK) [X] 2 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 16 *; | [A]EP0261520 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 2 * claim - *; | [A]DE19648283 (THERA GES FUER PATENTE [DE]) [A] 1-5 * page 2, line 5 - line 37 * * page 4, line 2 - line 15 * * page 5, line 10 - line 30 * * page 9, line 23 - line 43 * * page 10, line 46 - page 11, line 25 * * claims 1,2,8 *; | [A]EP0866086 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [PX]DE19736665 (ESPE DENTAL AG [DE]) [PX] 1-5 * page 2, line 1 - line 9 * * page 5, line 10 - line 39 * |