EP1125317 - CHAMBER LINER FOR SEMICONDUCTOR PROCESS CHAMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAM RESEARCH CORPORATION 4650 Cushing Parkway Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2001/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOEPP, Alan, M. 10010 Highway 9 Ben Lomond, CA 95005 / US | 02 /
DENTY, William, M., Jr. 2217 Kenwood Avenue San Jose, CA 95128 / US | 03 /
BARNES, Michael 12215 Santa Terasa Drive San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co., 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead, Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99969840.0 | 28.09.1999 | [2001/34] | WO1999US22488 | Priority number, date | US19980163722 | 30.09.1998 Original published format: US 163722 | [2001/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0019495 | Date: | 06.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1125317 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1125317 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
H01J37/32495 (EP,US);
H01L21/3065 (KR);
Y10S156/916 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2004/22] |
Former [2001/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KAMMERSCHUTZAUSKLEIDUNG FÜR HALBLEITERBEHANDLUNGSKAMMERN | [2001/34] | English: | CHAMBER LINER FOR SEMICONDUCTOR PROCESS CHAMBERS | [2001/34] | French: | GARNITURE DE CHAMBRE DESTINEE AUX CHAMBRES DE TRAITEMENT DE SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | [2001/34] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 09.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 23.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 23.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 23.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 28.09.2008 | GB | 13.11.2008 | [2010/06] | Cited in | International search | [A]US5605637 (SHAN HONGCHING [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,8-10,12,13,15-18,20 * abstract * * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 25 *; | [A]EP0814495 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1,2,5,7,9,10,13,16,18,20 * abstract *; | [A]US5348587 (EICHMAN ERIC C [US], et al) [A] 1,7,9,15,16,20 * abstract * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 2 *; | [A]US5641375 (NITESCU PETRU N [US], et al) [A] 1,8,9,15,16,20 * abstract * * column 4, lines 27-60 * |