EP1126837 - FULVIC ACID AND ITS USE IN THE TREATMENT OF VARIOUS CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfeinsmith Limited Kreuzweg 2 Postfach 735 9490 Vaduz / LI | [2006/34] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states Pfeinsmith Limited Kreuzweg 2 Postfach 735 9490 Vaduz / LI | ||
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states ENERKOM (PTY) LIMITED Building 46F, CSIR 0001 Pretoria / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEKKER, Johannes 313 Arizona Crescent 0043 Faerie Glen / ZA | 02 /
MEDLEN, Constance, Elizabeth 62 Morrison Avenue 0084 Rietondale / ZA | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Benson, John Everett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Benson, John Everett, et al J. A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99970022.2 | 08.10.1999 | [2001/35] | WO1999IB01649 | Priority number, date | ZA19980009190 | 08.10.1998 Original published format: ZA 9809190 | ZA19990002848 | 21.04.1999 Original published format: ZA 9902848 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0019999 | Date: | 13.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1126837 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1126837 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/353, A61P31/10, A61P31/04, A61P31/12 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/34] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FULVINSÄURE UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DIVERSEN KRANKHEITSZUSTÄNDEN | [2001/35] | English: | FULVIC ACID AND ITS USE IN THE TREATMENT OF VARIOUS CONDITIONS | [2001/35] | French: | ACIDE FULVIQUE ET UTILISATION DE CELUI-CI POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE DIVERS ETATS PATHOLOGIQUES | [2001/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 07.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06012243.9 / EP1698333 | EP06012244.7 / EP1700599 | EP06012245.4 / EP1700600 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2006 | BE | 23.08.2006 | CH | 23.08.2006 | CY | 23.08.2006 | FI | 23.08.2006 | IT | 23.08.2006 | LI | 23.08.2006 | NL | 23.08.2006 | LU | 08.10.2006 | IE | 09.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | DK | 23.11.2006 | SE | 23.11.2006 | GR | 24.11.2006 | ES | 04.12.2006 | PT | 24.01.2007 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
LU | 08.10.2006 | ||
IE | 09.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
BE | 23.08.2006 | ||
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH0687752 ; | [XY]CN1097990 ; | [PX]JPH119674 ; | [XY]DE2850685 (KNEER FRANZ X) [X] 1-4,7-10,12-15,17-20 * claim 1 * [Y] 5,6,11,16,21; | [Y]GB2244215 (NAT ENERGY COUNCIL [ZA]) [Y] 5,6,11,16,21 * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 10 ** pages 8-9 *; | [Y]WO9749288 (ORGANOCURE PROPRIETARY LIMITED [ZA], et al) [Y] 5,6,11,16,21 * page 2, lines 1-7 *; | CN1213665 [ ] (ZHU YAQIN [CN]); | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 17, Database accession no. 1994-140953, XP002127438 & JPH0687752 A 19940329 (KYOWA KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1-4,7-10,12-15,17-20 * abstract * [Y] 5,6,11,16,21 | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 21, Database accession no. 1997-226868, XP002127439 & CN1097990 A 19950201 (KANG H) [X] 1-4,7-10,12-15,17-20 * abstract * [Y] 5,6,11,16,21 | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 13, Database accession no. 1999-146250, XP002127440 & JPH119674 A 19990119 (KOGA K) [PX] 1-4,7-10,12-15,17-20 * abstract * | [PX] - ZHU YAUIN, "Prepn. of medcinal-grade peat soldium fulvic acid", EPODOC, EUROOPEAN PATENT OFFICE, (19990414), XP002127437 [PX] 1,7,12,17,20 * abstract * |