EP1127013 - DISPENSER WITH PERIPHERAL DELIVERY MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REXAM DISPENSING SYSTEMS 15 bis, Route Nationale 76470 Le Tréport / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states REXAM DISPENSING SYSTEMS 15 bis, route Nationale 76470 Le Tréport / FR | ||
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states REXAM SOFAB 15 bis, route Nationale 76450 Le Tréport / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUGAMONT, Jean-Louis 73, avenue Charles Gounod F-76260 Eu / FR | 02 /
ROY, Christophe 73, quai Henri IV F-76200 Dieppe / FR | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Busnel, Jean-Benoît, et al NOVAGRAAF IP 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois- Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Busnel, Jean-Benoît, et al Howrey Simon Arnold & White, CityPoint, One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9HS / GB | ||
Former [2001/35] | Busnel, Jean-Benoît, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99970070.1 | 05.10.1999 | [2001/35] | WO1999FR02370 | Priority number, date | FR19980012556 | 07.10.1998 Original published format: FR 9812556 | [2001/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0020294 | Date: | 13.04.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1127013 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1127013 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/34, B05B11/00 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
B05B11/1015 (EP,US);
B05B11/1088 (EP,US);
B05B11/1001 (EP,US);
B05B11/109 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/33] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPENDER MIT RINGFÖRMIGER AUSGABE | [2001/35] | English: | DISPENSER WITH PERIPHERAL DELIVERY MODE | [2001/35] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR A MODE DE DELIVRANCE PERIPHERIQUE | [2001/35] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 10.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3502035 (FEDIT RENE, et al) [A] 1,8,11,13 * column 4, line 59 - line 64; figure 4 *; | [A]FR2517990 (CESKOSLOVENSKA AKADEMIE VED [CS]) [A] 1,9 * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 16 *; | [A]US4757922 (LANDECKER DAVID J [US]) [A] 2-5 * column W *; | [A]US5282552 (OPHARDT HEINER [CA]) [A] 1,9 * column 6, line 1 - line 31 *; | [A]US5687877 (SMOLEN JR RICHARD J [US]) [A] 14* column 3, line 36 - line 39 * |