EP1119662 - PLATE WHICH IS SUITED AS A NOISE PROTECTION WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2006/34] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Röhm GmbH & Co. KG Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÖLA, Egbert Hyrtlgasse 4 A-7052 Müllendorf / AT | 02 /
SEELMANN, Peter Dreiständegasse 3/2 A-1238 Wien / AT | 03 /
MOLNAR, Gerald Todescogasse 5 A-2440 Gramatneusiedl / AT | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Mai, Peter M. Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/16] | Mai, Peter M. Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 99970138.6 | 22.09.1999 | [2001/31] | WO1999EP07058 | Priority number, date | DE1998146024 | 06.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19846024 | [2001/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0020690 | Date: | 13.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1119662 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1119662 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E01F8/00 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
E01F8/0023 (EP,US);
E01F8/0017 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/31] | Title | German: | ALS LÄRMSCHUTZWAND GEEIGNETE PLATTE | [2001/31] | English: | PLATE WHICH IS SUITED AS A NOISE PROTECTION WALL | [2001/31] | French: | PANNEAU UTILISE COMME PAROI ANTIBRUIT | [2001/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 10.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.06.2006 | LU | 22.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | LU | 22.09.2006 | |
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/18] | MC | 30.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2051675 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE8535183U (K. SCHÜTTE); | [A]EP0769595 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [A] 1,7,9-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9746370 (ICI PLC [GB], et al); | [DY]EP0826832 (ATOHAAS HOLDING CV [NL]) [DY] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0407852 | EP0826832 |