EP1127297 - METHOD FOR ESTIMATING THE DURATION OF THE INTERRUPTIONS IN THE SUPPLY FROM THE ELECTRIC MAINS IN AN ELECTRIC APPARATUS HAVING AN ELECTRONIC CONTROL, IN PARTICULAR A HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE, AND APPARATUS IMPLEMENTING SUCH A METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WRAP S.p.A. Via Lamberto Corsi, 55 60044 Fabriano (Ancona) / IT | [2004/22] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states WRAP S.p.A. Viale Aristide Merloni 47 60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AISA, Valerio Via Serraloggia, 78/A I-60044 Fabriano / IT | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Dini, Roberto, et al Metroconsult S.r.l. Via Sestriere 100 10060 None (TO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dini, Roberto, et al Metroconsult S.r.l. Via Sestriere 10 10060 None (TO) / IT | ||
Former [2004/03] | Dini, Roberto, Dr. Ing., et al c/o Metroconsult S.r.l. Piazza Cavour 3 10060 None (Torino) / IT | ||
Former [2001/35] | Dini, Roberto, Dr. Ing. Via Castagnole, 59 10060 None (Torino) / IT | Application number, filing date | 99970176.6 | 08.10.1999 | [2001/35] | WO1999IB01648 | Priority number, date | IT1998TO00853 | 08.10.1998 Original published format: IT TO980853 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0020931 | Date: | 13.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1127297 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1127297 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G04F7/00, F25D29/00, H05B6/68 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
H05B6/68 (EP,US);
G01K13/00 (EP,US);
F25D29/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/19] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHÄTZEN DER DAUER VON STROMVERSORGUNGSUNTERBRECHUNGEN IN EINEM - ELEKTRISCHEN GERÄT MIT ELEKTRONISCHER STEUERUNG,INSBESONDERE EINEM HAUSHALTSGE- RÄT ,UND DIESES VERFAHREN VERWENDENDES GERÄT | [2001/35] | English: | METHOD FOR ESTIMATING THE DURATION OF THE INTERRUPTIONS IN THE SUPPLY FROM THE ELECTRIC MAINS IN AN ELECTRIC APPARATUS HAVING AN ELECTRONIC CONTROL, IN PARTICULAR A HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE, AND APPARATUS IMPLEMENTING SUCH A METHOD | [2001/35] | French: | METHODE PERMETTANT D'ETABLIR DES VALEURS ESTIMATIVES DE LA DUREE D'INTERRUPTIONS SURVENUES DANS L'ALIMENTATION RESEAU D'UN APPAREIL ELECTRIQUE, A COMMANDE ELECTRONIQUE, NOTAMMENT D'UN APPAREIL ELECTROMENAGER, ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE METTRE EN OEUVRE CETTE METHODE | [2001/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 11.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.05.2005 | BE | 11.05.2005 | CH | 11.05.2005 | FI | 11.05.2005 | FR | 11.05.2005 | LI | 11.05.2005 | NL | 11.05.2005 | DK | 11.08.2005 | GR | 11.08.2005 | SE | 11.08.2005 | ES | 22.08.2005 | CY | 08.10.2005 | PT | 19.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
CY | 08.10.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
FR | 31.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
CY | 08.10.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 11.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2031631 (SHEW A) [A] 1-32; | [A]GB2132429 (BROWN SIMON GRANT) [A] 1-32; | [A]US4884626 (FILIPOWSKI MERLE M [US])[A] 1-32; | [XA]EP0819945 (VALEO ELECTRONIQUE [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,14,15,17 * the whole document * [A] 3,5-13,16,18-32 |