EP1183187 - A STERILIZABLE CULTIVATION SYSTEM WITH SEPARATELY ATTACHABLE MICROFILTRATION MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hsu, Wei K. 113 Highway 24 Commerce, TX 75429 / US | [2002/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Kiliaridis, Constantin, et al Bugnion S.A. 10, Route de Florissant Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Kiliaridis, Constantin, et al Bugnion S.A., 10, Route de Florissant, Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | Application number, filing date | 99970640.1 | 21.10.1999 | [2002/10] | WO1999US24559 | Priority number, date | CN1998229712 | 21.10.1998 Original published format: CN 98229712 | CN1998229711 | 21.10.1998 Original published format: CN 98229711 | US19990422030 | 20.10.1999 Original published format: US 422030 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0023331 | Date: | 27.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1183187 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/00, C12M1/24 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
C12M29/20 (EP);
A01G18/66 (EP);
A01G9/02 (EP);
C12M23/14 (EP);
C12M23/24 (EP);
C12M29/04 (EP);
C12M37/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/10] | B65D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/10] | Title | German: | STERILISIERBARES ZUCHTSYSTEM MIT GETRENNT ANBRINGBAREN MIKROFILTRATIONSMEMBRAN | [2002/10] | English: | A STERILIZABLE CULTIVATION SYSTEM WITH SEPARATELY ATTACHABLE MICROFILTRATION MEMBRANE | [2002/10] | French: | SYSTEME DE CULTURE POUVANT ETRE STERILISE A MEMBRANE DE MICROFILTRATION CAPABLE D'ETRE FIXEE LIBERABLE | [2002/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2001 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/49] | 18.05.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 03.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/49] | 05.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4311477 (KITAMURA RYUTARO, et al) [X] 1,4,5,18,19 * abstract * * column 1, line 47 - line 57; figure 2 * * column 2, line 64 - line 68; example 1 *; | [X]US4027427 (STOLLER BENJAMIN B, et al) [X] 1,2,17-19 * abstract *; | [X]US4935371 (RICKLOFF JAMES R [US]) [X] 1,2,17,19 * abstract *; | [A]US4271270 (LUKACSEK PATRICIA A) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3218532 (GREINER & SOEHNE C A [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US6358731 (HSU WEI K [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9115569 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US5230430 (KIDDER JOHN W [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4027427 (STOLLER BENJAMIN B, et al); | [Y]US4311477 (KITAMURA RYUTARO, et al); | [Y]US4935371 (RICKLOFF JAMES R [US]) |