EP1123059 - SYSTEM FOR POSITIONING PATIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/33] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR POSITIONING PATIENTS | ||
[2004/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Varian Medical Systems Technologies, Inc. 3100 Hansen Way Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2004/22] |
Former [2001/33] | For all designated states Varian Medical Systems, Inc. Legal Dept., 3100 Hansen Way Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIAZIAT, Majid, L. 1210 Woodflower Way San Jose, CA 95117 / US | 02 /
MARC, Marcel 5038 Bel Estos Drive San Jose, CA 95124 / US | 03 /
MANSFIELD, Stanley 1137 S. Bernardo Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 04 /
MOSTAFAVI, Hassan 1281 Via Huerta Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Schlee, Alexander Richard Viering, Jentschura & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | Schlee, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. Viering, Jentschura & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99970910.8 | 22.10.1999 | [2001/33] | WO1999US24835 | Priority number, date | US19980178385 | 23.10.1998 Original published format: US 178385 | [2001/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0024333 | Date: | 04.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1123059 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1123059 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
A61N5/1049 (EP,KR,US);
A61B90/39 (EP,KR,US);
A61N5/1069 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2090/371 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2090/3937 (EP,KR,US);
A61N2005/1059 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/33] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM POSITIONIEREN EINES PATIENTEN | [2004/41] | English: | SYSTEM FOR POSITIONING PATIENTS | [2004/41] | French: | SYSTEME DE POSITIONNEMENT DE PATIENTS | [2004/41] |
Former [2001/33] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM POSITIONIEREN EINES PATIENTEN | ||
Former [2001/33] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR POSITIONING PATIENTS | ||
Former [2001/33] | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE POSITIONNEMENT DE PATIENTS | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 09.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.2005 | BE | 27.04.2005 | CH | 27.04.2005 | FI | 27.04.2005 | IT | 27.04.2005 | LI | 27.04.2005 | NL | 27.04.2005 | DK | 27.07.2005 | GR | 27.07.2005 | ES | 07.08.2005 | PT | 10.10.2005 | CY | 22.10.2005 | IE | 24.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
CY | 22.10.2005 | ||
IE | 24.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
IE | 24.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
CH | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
LI | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
ES | 07.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 27.04.2005 | |
BE | 27.04.2005 | ||
FI | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 27.04.2005 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US5315630 (STURM VOLKER [DE], et al) [Y] 9-11 * column 4, line 13 - line 22 *[A] 1,12,21,33,36; | [XAY]US5446548 (GERIG LEE H [CA], et al) [X] 1-8,12-18,21,22,28,33,34,36 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 13; figure 1 * * column 7, line 43 - line 57 * [A] 37 [Y] 9-11,19,20,23-27,29,31,32; | [Y]US5662111 (COSMAN ERIC R [US]) [Y] 19,20,23-27 * column 8, line 28 - line 48; figure 6 *; | [XY]WO9838908 (SCHNEIDER MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES [US], et al) [X] 30 * page 26, line 8 - line 16; figures 10,11 * * page 25, line 14 - line 17; figure 12 * [Y] 29,31,32 |