EP1042031 - AXIALLY ACTIVATED HEMOSTASIS VALVE WITH LUMEN SIZE SELECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael Barbados, West Indies / BB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Center, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBERT, Kathryn, M. 185 Washington Street Saratoga Springs, NY 12866 / US | 02 /
WEST, Ronald, L. 40 Clay Hill Road Fort Anne, NY 12827 / US | 03 /
LAMSON, Theodore, C. 2172 Camino Brazos Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Kiliaridis, Constantin, et al Bugnion S.A. 10, Route de Florissant Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Kiliaridis, Constantin, et al Bugnion S.A., 10, Route de Florissant, Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | Application number, filing date | 99970933.0 | 25.10.1999 | [2000/41] | WO1999US25010 | Priority number, date | US19980105384P | 23.10.1998 Original published format: US 105384 P | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0024453 | Date: | 04.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1042031 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/06 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
A61M39/0613 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/41] | Title | German: | AXIAL AKTIVIERBARES HAEMOSTATISCHES VENTIL MIT AUSWAHL DER LUMENGRÖSSE | [2000/41] | English: | AXIALLY ACTIVATED HEMOSTASIS VALVE WITH LUMEN SIZE SELECTION | [2000/41] | French: | SOUPAPE HEMOSTATIQUE ACTIONNEE AXIALEMENT A DIAMETRE SELECTIF DE LA LUMIERE | [2000/41] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/03] | 10.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3324699 (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG) [X] 1,2,8,9,14-16 * column 2, line 13 - line 36 * * column 6, line 16 - line 37 * * figure 5 *; | [A]US4660802 (OSCARSSON ROLF A [US]) [A] 16 * column 7, line 51 - column 9, line 15 ** figures 2-5 *; | [X]US5338313 (MOLLENAUER KENNETH H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,14-16 * column 10, line 17 - column 13, line 46 * * figures 6-9 *; | [XA]US5364371 (KAMEN DEAN L [US]) [X] 1,2,10 * column 3, line 54 - line 65 * * figures 3,4 * [A] 6,7,13; | [A]EP0658357 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [A] 3 * figures 1,5F *; | [A]WO9703719 (WOLLSCHLAEGER HELMUT [DE]) [A] 5,10-12 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 25 * * figures 7-10 * |