EP1128901 - THERMOMEMBRANE METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Noack, Andreas Am Jungstück 41 55130 Mainz / DE | [2003/04] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states Noack, Andreas Gothaerstrasse 4a 63322 Rödermark / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Maiwald, Walter Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99970946.2 | 26.10.1999 | [2001/36] | WO1999EP08069 | Priority number, date | DE19981049216 | 26.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19849216 | [2001/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0024500 | Date: | 04.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1128901 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1128901 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/02, B01D69/10, B01D53/22 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
C01B13/0259 (EP,US);
B01D53/22 (KR);
B01D53/02 (EP,US);
B01D53/04 (EP,US);
B01D53/229 (EP,US);
B01J20/20 (EP,US);
B01J20/28033 (EP,US);
B01J20/28057 (EP,US);
B01J20/3416 (EP,US);
B01J20/3441 (EP,US);
B01J20/3491 (EP,US);
C01B3/56 (EP,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
B01D2253/311 (EP,US);
B01D2256/10 (EP,US);
B01D2257/104 (EP,US);
C01B2203/042 (EP,US);
C01B2203/047 (EP,US);
C01B2203/048 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMOMEMBRANVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2001/36] | English: | THERMOMEMBRANE METHOD AND DEVICE | [2001/36] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF A THERMOMEMBRANE | [2001/36] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 02.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 26.03.2003 | FR | 26.03.2003 | GR | 26.03.2003 | IE | 26.03.2003 | IT | 26.03.2003 | NL | 26.03.2003 | DK | 26.06.2003 | PT | 26.06.2003 | SE | 26.06.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | AT | 26.10.2003 | CY | 26.10.2003 | LU | 26.10.2003 | BE | 31.10.2003 | CH | 31.10.2003 | LI | 31.10.2003 | MC | 31.10.2003 | [2008/18] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
FR | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
IE | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
AT | 26.10.2003 | ||
CY | 26.10.2003 | ||
LU | 26.10.2003 | ||
BE | 31.10.2003 | ||
CH | 31.10.2003 | ||
LI | 31.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.10.2003 | ||
Former [2005/13] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
IE | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
AT | 26.10.2003 | ||
CY | 26.10.2003 | ||
LU | 26.10.2003 | ||
BE | 31.10.2003 | ||
CH | 31.10.2003 | ||
LI | 31.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.10.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
IE | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
CY | 26.10.2003 | ||
LU | 26.10.2003 | ||
BE | 31.10.2003 | ||
CH | 31.10.2003 | ||
LI | 31.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.10.2003 | ||
Former [2005/01] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
IE | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
CY | 26.10.2003 | ||
LU | 26.10.2003 | ||
BE | 31.10.2003 | ||
CH | 31.10.2003 | ||
LI | 31.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
IE | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
CY | 26.10.2003 | ||
LU | 26.10.2003 | ||
CH | 31.10.2003 | ||
LI | 31.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
IE | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
CY | 26.10.2003 | ||
LU | 26.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
IE | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
CY | 26.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
IE | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
IE | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 26.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1572796 (JOHNSON MATTHEY CO LTD) [Y] 4,5,16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3225751 (KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE) [A] 1-21,24,28 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0358110 (RENNEBECK KLAUS) [X] 1-3,6-14,17-19,22,23,25,26 * column 35, line 1 - column 39, line 37; figure 15 *; | [A]DE3918430 (SOMMER WERNER DR ING [DE]) [A] 1-21,23 * column 5, line 59 - column 8, line 8; figure - *; | [XY]WO9423814 (ENVIROSEP INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6-14,17,18,23 * page 7, line 28 - page 9, line 14 * * page 11, line 25 - page 12, line 12 * * page 12, line 37 - page 13, line 16; figures 1-7 * [Y] 4,5,16; | [A]WO9609877 (LE CLOIREC PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 1-21,23* page 5, line 1 - line 37; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9735805 (SAES PURE GAS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-21,24,28 * page 6, line 18 - page 9, line 21 * * page 11, line 9 - line 26; figures 1-8 * |