EP1123514 - REMOTE TEST MODULE FOR AUTOMATIC TEST EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teradyne, Inc. 321 Harrison Avenue Boston, Massachusetts 02118 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | For all designated states TERADYNE, INC. 321 Harrison Avenue Boston, Massachusetts 02118 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FULLER, Jonathan 795 San Carlos Court Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 02 /
CRAPUCHETTES, Charles 3419 Creighton Place Santa Clara, CA 95051-1501 / US | 03 /
NELSON, Stuart 1588 Shasta Avenue San Jose, CA 95126 / US | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99971095.7 | 21.10.1999 | [2001/33] | WO1999US24704 | Priority number, date | US19980178257 | 23.10.1998 Original published format: US 178257 | [2001/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0025144 | Date: | 04.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1123514 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1123514 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/319 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
G01R31/31724 (EP,US);
G01R31/31905 (EP,US);
G01R31/3191 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2003/02] |
Former [2001/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | TESTMODULE FÜR AUTOMATISCHE TESTANORDNUNG | [2001/33] | English: | REMOTE TEST MODULE FOR AUTOMATIC TEST EQUIPMENT | [2001/33] | French: | MODULE D'ESSAI A DISTANCE DESTINE A UN MATERIEL D'ESSAI AUTOMATIQUE | [2001/33] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0566823 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,8-13,15,19,20,23,24 * see abstract *; | [XY]US5111459 (DEVIGNE YVES [FR]) [X] 1 * see abstract * [Y] 4-7,15,17; | [Y]US5794175 (CONNER GEORGE W [US]) [Y] 5 * see abstract *; | [Y]US4730318 (BOGHOLTZ JR RICHARD [US], et al) [Y] 6,7 * see abstract *; | [Y]EP0802418 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 4,6,7,15,17 * see abstract *; | [A]US5712858 (GODIWALA NITIN DHIROOBHAI [US], et al) [A] 1 * see abstract * |