EP1124540 - DOSAGE FORMS CONTAINING TASTE MASKED ACTIVE AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biovail Laboratories International S.r.l. Chelston Park, Building 2 Collymore Rock St. Michael BH1 / BB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Biovail Laboratories International S.R.L. Chelston Park, Building 2 Collymore Rock St. Michael BH1 / BB | ||
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states Biovail Technologies Ltd 14555 Avion at Lakeside Chantilly, VA 20151 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEZAACHE, Djelila 8609 Accokeek Street Laurel, MD 20724 / US | 02 /
RAIDEN, Michael, G. 6370 Snickersville Tpk. Purcellville, VA 20132-4919 / US | 03 /
SANGHVI, Pradeepkumar, P. 2515 Isham Randolph Drive Herndon, VA 20171 / US | 04 /
SZEDLOCK, Scott, J. 20668 Suffolk Court Riverside, California 92508 / US | [2001/44] |
Former [2001/34] | 01 /
MEZAACHE, Djelila 8609 Accokeek Street Laurel, MD 20724 / US | ||
02 /
RAIDEN, Michael, G. 6370 Snickersville Tpk. Purcellville, VA 20132-4919 / US | |||
03 /
SANGHVI, Pradeepkumar, P. 2515 Isham Randolph Drive Herndon, VA 20171 / US | |||
04 /
SZEDLOCK, Scott, J. 4447 Fairstone Drive Fairfax, VA 22033 / US | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | Burford, Anthony Frederick W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99971312.6 | 26.10.1999 | [2001/34] | WO1999US25059 | Priority number, date | US19980183501 | 30.10.1998 Original published format: US 183501 | [2001/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0025755 | Date: | 11.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1124540 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1124540 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/26 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
A61K9/0056 (EP,US);
A61K9/2081 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/43] | A61K9/26, A61K31/165, A61K31/167 | ||
Former IPC [2004/03] | A61K9/26, A61K31/165 | ||
Former IPC [2001/34] | A61K9/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOSIERUNGSFORMEN ENTHALTEND GESCHMACKSMASKIERTEN WIRKSTOFFEN | [2004/43] | English: | DOSAGE FORMS CONTAINING TASTE MASKED ACTIVE AGENTS | [2001/34] | French: | FORMES GALENIQUES CONTENANT DES PRINCIPES ACTIFS AU GOUT MASQUE | [2001/34] |
Former [2001/34] | DOSISFORMEN, DIE GESCHMAKSMASKIERTE WIRKSTOFFE ENTHALTEN | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 31.05.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.01.2006 | 17.01.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.01.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2006 | BE | 22.11.2006 | CH | 22.11.2006 | CY | 22.11.2006 | FI | 22.11.2006 | LI | 22.11.2006 | NL | 22.11.2006 | DK | 22.02.2007 | SE | 22.02.2007 | GR | 23.02.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [DPXL]WO9908658 (FUISZ TECHNOLOGIES LTD [US]) [DPX] 1-9 * the priority claim of the present application might not be justified; page 23 - page 24; example 5 *[L] |