EP1127157 - METHYLATED CpG ISLAND AMPLIFICATION (MCA) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE JOHNS HOPKINS UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE 720 Rutland Avenue Baltimore, MD 21205 / US | [2001/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Issa, Jean-Pierre 12310 Longworth Lane Houston, TX 77024 / US | 02 /
Baylin, Stephen Apt. 419, Harbor Hill Apts., 301 Warren Avenue Baltimore, MD 21230 / US | 03 /
Toyota, Minoru, c/o Sapporo University Cancer Res.Inst., Dept.Med.Biol. S-1,W-17, Chuo-ku Sapporo 060-8556 / JP | [2002/42] |
Former [2001/35] | 01 /
Issa, Jean-Pierre 12310 Longworth Lane Houston, TX 77024 / US | ||
02 /
Baylin, Stephen Apt. 419, Harbor Hill Apts., 301 Warren Avenue Baltimore, MD 21230 / US | |||
03 /
Toyota, Minoru Apt. 102, 6804 Harrowdale Road Baltimore, MD 21209 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/35] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99971462.9 | 02.11.1999 | [2001/35] | WO1999US25251 | Priority number, date | US19980106925P | 03.11.1998 Original published format: US 106925 P | US19990309175 | 10.05.1999 Original published format: US 309175 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0026401 | Date: | 11.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1127157 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.05.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/44, C12Q1/48, C12Q1/68, C12P19/34, C12N9/22, C12N15/00, C07H21/02, C07H21/04 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
C12Q1/48 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6809 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6855 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6809, C12Q2531/113, C12Q2525/191, C12Q2521/331 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6855, C12Q2521/331 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/35] | Title | German: | AMPLIFIKATION METHYLIERTER CpG-INSELN | [2001/35] | English: | METHYLATED CpG ISLAND AMPLIFICATION (MCA) | [2001/35] | French: | AMPLIFICATION D'ILOTS CpG METHYLES (MCA) | [2001/35] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2001 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.06.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 11.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/39] | 06.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - KOHNO TAKASHI ET AL, "identification of CpG islands hypermethylated in human lung cancer the arbitrarily primed-PCR method.", HUMAN GENETICS, (199803), vol. 102, no. 3, ISSN 0340-6717, pages 258 - 264, XP002211910 [X] 7,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004390050689 | [X] - USHIJIMA T ET AL, "ESTABLISHMENT OF METHYLATION-SENSITIVE-REPRESENTATIONAL DIFFERENCE ANALYSIS AND ISOLATION OF HYPO- AND HYPERMETHYLATED GENOMIC FRAGMENTS IN MOUSE LIVER TUMORS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (199703), vol. 94, no. 6, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2284 - 2289, XP001037969 [X] 7,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.6.2284 | [PX] - TOYOTA MINORU ET AL, "Identification of differentially methylated sequences in colorectal cancer by methylated CpG island amplification.", CANCER RESEARCH, (19990515), vol. 59, no. 10, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 2307 - 2312, XP002211911 [PX] 1-49 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO9745560 (NORTH SHORE UNIV HOSPITAL [US]); | [Y]WO9635704 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS MED [US]); | [A]US5786146 (HERMAN JAMES G [US], et al); | [AP]US5912147 (STOLER DANIEL [US], et al); | [A]US5501964 (WIGLER MICHAEL [US], et al); | [Y] - ZRIHAN-LICHT ET AL., "DNA methylation status of the Mucl gene coding for a breast-cancer-associated protein", INT. J. CANCER,, (199507), vol. 62, no. 3, pages 245-251 - 246-259, XP002927716 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.2910620303 | [Y] - MERLO A, HERMAN J G, "DNA METHYLATION AND INACTIVATION OF TUMOR SUPPRESSOR GENES", HEREDITARY CANCER, XX, XX, XX, (19950901), pages 152 - 160, XP002927717 | [Y] - WEST ET AL., "Hypomethylation of the amyloid precursor protein gene in the brain of an Alzheimer's disease patient", J. MOL. NEUROSCIENCE,, (1995), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 141 - 146, XP002927718 | [A] - AHUJA ET AL., "Association between CpG island methylation and microsatellite instability in colorectal cancer", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH,, (199703), vol. 38, pages 360 - 361, XP002927719 | [A] - LISITSYN ET AL., "Cloning the differences between two complex genomes", SCIENCE,, (19930212), vol. 259, pages 946 - 951, XP002927720 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.8438152 |