EP1131344 - RETRO-INVERSION PEPTIDES THAT TARGET GASTRO-INTESTINAL TRACT TRANSPORT RECEPTORS AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/37] | RETRO-INVERSION PEPTIDES THAT TARGET GIT TRANSPORT RECEPTORS AND RELATED METHODS | ||
[2005/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merrion Research I Limited Unit 3015 Lake Drive National Digital Park Citywest Dublin 24 / IE | [2006/10] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states Adaptiv Biopharma Limited Unit 3015 Lake Drive National Digital Park, Citywest Dublin 24 / IE | ||
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states ELAN CORPORATION, Plc Lincoln House, Lincoln Place Dublin 2 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'MAHONY, Daniel Joseph 75 Avoca Park, Avoca Avenue Blackrock, County Dublin / IE | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Ryan, Anne Mary, et al Anne Ryan & Co 2 Crofton Terrace Dun Laoghaire, County Dublin A96 V6P7 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Ryan, Anne Mary, et al c/o Anne Ryan & Co. 60 Northumberland Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 99972640.9 | 19.11.1999 | [2001/37] | WO1999IE00117 | Priority number, date | US19980109038P | 19.11.1998 Original published format: US 109038 P | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0031123 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1131344 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1131344 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/08, C07K19/00, A61K38/10, C07K7/02 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
C07K7/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/6425 (EP,US);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEGEN GASTROINTESTINALE TRANSPORT REZEPTOREN GERICHTETE RETRO-INVERTIERTE PEPTIDE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2005/18] | English: | RETRO-INVERSION PEPTIDES THAT TARGET GASTRO-INTESTINAL TRACT TRANSPORT RECEPTORS AND USE THEREOF | [2005/18] | French: | PEPTIDES RETRO-INVERSES CIBLANT LES RECEPTEURS DE TRANSPORT DU TRACTUS GASTRO-INTESTINAL, ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2005/18] |
Former [2001/37] | RETROINVERSIVE PEPTIDE ZUR BINDUNG AN TRANSPORTREZEPTOREN DESGASTROINTESTINALTRAKTES UND DAMIT VERBUNDENE METHODEN | ||
Former [2001/37] | RETRO-INVERSION PEPTIDES THAT TARGET GIT TRANSPORT RECEPTORS AND RELATED METHODS | ||
Former [2001/37] | PEPTIDES RETRO-INVERSES CIBLANT LES RECEPTEURS DE TRANSPORT DU TRACTUS GASTRO-INTESTINAL, ET METHODES ASSOCIEES | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 09.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 20.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 15.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Request for further processing for: | 24.03.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 07.04.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.04.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.2005 | FI | 03.08.2005 | NL | 03.08.2005 | DK | 03.11.2005 | GR | 03.11.2005 | SE | 03.11.2005 | ES | 14.11.2005 | CY | 19.11.2005 | PT | 03.01.2006 | [2007/23] |
Former [2006/26] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9717613 (ELAN CORP PLC [IE], et al) [Y] 1,3-12,14-31,33-42 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9851825 (ELAN CORP PLC [IE], et al) [PX] 1-43 * the whole document *; | [PXD]WO9851325 (CYTOGEN CORP [US], et al) [PXD] 1-43* the whole document *; | [X] - BRUGIDOU J ET AL, "The retro-inverso form of a homeobox-derived short peptide is rapidly internalised by cultured neurones: A new basis for an efficient intracellular delivery system", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS,US,ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, (19950914), vol. 214, no. 2, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 685 - 693, XP002087116 [X] 3-12,14-31,33-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1995.2340 | [Y] - LIANG R ET AL, "HUMAN INTESTINAL H+/PEPTIDE COTRANSPORTER. CLONING, FUNCTIONAL EXPRESSION, AND CHROMOSOMAL LOCALIZATION", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, (19950324), vol. 270, no. 12, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 6456 - 6463, XP002912968 [Y] 1,3-12,14-31,33-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.12.6456 | [YD] - JAMESON BRADFORD A ET AL, "A rationally designed CD4 analogue inhibits experimental allergic encephalomyelitis.", NATURE (LONDON) 1994, (1994), vol. 368, no. 6473, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 744 - 746, XP000887240 [YD] 1,3-12,14-31,33-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/368744a0 | [Y] - GUICHARD G ET AL, "ANTIGENIC MIMICRY OF NATURAL L-PEPTIDES WITH RETRO-INVERSO- PEPTIDOMIMETICS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,US,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, (19941001), vol. 91, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9765 - 9769, XP002054075 [Y] 1,3-12,14-31,33-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.21.9765 | [A] - BRAYDEN, D.J. AND D.J. O'MAHONY, "Novel oral drug delivery gateways for biotechnology products: polypetides and vaccines", PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY TODAY, (199810), vol. 1, no. 7, pages 291 - 299, XP000909907 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1461-5347(98)00075-3 |