EP1134674 - DATA STRUCTURE OF DIGITAL MAP FILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKANO, Nobuyuki Room 301 Tsuso 10, Ikuno 4-chome Katano-shi Osaka 576-0054 / JP | 02 /
IHARA, Yasuhiro 352 Crestview Boulevard Walled Lake, MI 48390 / US | 03 /
UEYAMA, Yoshiki 610, Hamaderashowacho 5-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 592-8345 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Akihiro 12-11, Taimacho Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572-0078 / JP | 05 /
FUKUDA, Hisaya Room 301 Verudomiiru Ibaraki 7-20, Sho 2-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0806 / JP | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/38] | Lang, Johannes, Dipl.-Ing. Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Isenbruck, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99972761.3 | 24.11.1999 | [2001/38] | WO1999JP06543 | Priority number, date | JP19980332412 | 24.11.1998 Original published format: JP 33241298 | JP19990165940 | 11.06.1999 Original published format: JP 16594099 | [2001/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0031663 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1134674 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.06.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/32 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
G01C21/3878 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q50/00 (KR);
G01C21/3815 (EP,KR,US);
G06T1/00 (KR);
G01C21/3896 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/38] | G06F17/30, G01C21/00, G09B29/00, G06T1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | DATENSTRUKTUR FÜR DIGITALE KARTE | [2011/29] | English: | DATA STRUCTURE OF DIGITAL MAP FILE | [2001/38] | French: | STRUCTURE DE DONNÉES D'UN FICHIER CARTOGRAPHIQUE NUMÉRIQUE | [2011/29] |
Former [2001/38] | DATENSTRUKTUR FPÜR DUGUTALE KARTE | ||
Former [2001/38] | STRUCTURE DE DONN ES D'UN FICHIER CARTOGRAPHIQUE NUM RIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2001 | Translation filed | 23.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2001 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.05.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 21.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/22] | 13.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0306075 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-14,23-27 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0479364 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [Y] 1-12,23-27,33,34 * the whole document *; | [IY]US5150295 (MATTINGLY WILLIAM [US]) [I] 13,14,28 * figure 2 * * column 4, line 5 - column 5, line 7 * * column 7, lines 9-50 * * column 9, line 42 - column 12, line 57 * [Y] 1-12,23-27; | [X]US5445524 (JONES JOHN A [US]) [X] 13,14,28* figure 1 *; | [YA]EP0782120 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 33,34 * figures 15,16 * * column 11, line 3 - column 12, line 9 * * column 19, lines 14-44 * [A] 1-12,23-27; | [A]EP0833290 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12,23-27 * column 11, line 14 - column 12, line 51 * | International search | [A]JPS6386074 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]US4924402 (ANDO HITOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]JPH04263366 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]JPH0511692 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC); | [A]JPH07103775 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]EP0807803 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JPH10255022 (SONY CORP); | [A]EP0875878 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JPH10255022 | EP0875878 |