EP1143541 - STORAGE BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKIKAISYA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Asakawa, Kieko 3-1, Nishi-machi 6-chome Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-0025 / JP | |||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Asakawa, Kieko 3-1, Nishi-machi 6-chome Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-0025 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASAKAWA, Fumihiko DI . / JP | 02 /
KIMOTO, Shinya, @Panasonic Ev Energy Co., Ltd. 555, Sakaijuku Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0452 / JP | 03 /
TAKAKI, Mitsugu, @Panasonic Ev Energy Co., Ltd. 555, Sakaijuku Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0452 / JP | 04 /
KIMURA, Kenji, @Panasonic Ev Energy Co., Ltd. 555, Sakaijuku Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0452 / JP | 05 /
YOKOYAMA, Toshinobu, @Panasonic Ev Energy Co., Ltd. 555, Sakaijuku Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0452 / JP | 06 /
FUKUDA, Shinsuke, @Panasonic Ev Energy Co., Ltd. 555, Sakaijuku Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0452 / JP | 07 /
TAKAHASHI, Yasuhiro, @Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-0826 / JP | 08 /
KATSUTA, Toshihiro, @Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-0826 / JP | 09 /
Asakawa, Kieko 3-1 Nishi-machi 6 chome Toyota-shi Aichi 471- 0025 / JP | [2011/36] |
Former [2011/34] | 01 /
ASAKAWA, Fumihiko DI . / JP | ||
02 /
KIMOTO, Shinya, Panasonic Ev Energy Co., Ltd. 555, Sakaijuku Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0452 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKAKI, Mitsugu, Panasonic Ev Energy Co., Ltd. 555, Sakaijuku Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0452 / JP | |||
04 /
KIMURA, Kenji, Panasonic Ev Energy Co., Ltd. 555, Sakaijuku Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0452 / JP | |||
05 /
YOKOYAMA, Toshinobu, Panasonic Ev Energy Co., Ltd. 555, Sakaijuku Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0452 / JP | |||
06 /
FUKUDA, Shinsuke, Panasonic Ev Energy Co., Ltd. 555, Sakaijuku Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0452 / JP | |||
07 /
TAKAHASHI, Yasuhiro, Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-0826 / JP | |||
08 /
KATSUTA, Toshihiro, Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-0826 / JP | |||
09 /
Asakawa, Kieko 3-1 Nishi-machi 6 chome Toyota-shi Aichi 471- 0025 / JP | |||
Former [2001/41] | 01 /
ASAKAWA, Fumihiko DI . / JP | ||
02 /
KIMOTO, Shinya, Panasonic Ev Energy Co., Ltd. 555, Sakaijuku Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0452 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKAKI, Mitsugu, Panasonic Ev Energy Co., Ltd. 555, Sakaijuku Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0452 / JP | |||
04 /
KIMURA, Kenji, Panasonic Ev Energy Co., Ltd. 555, Sakaijuku Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0452 / JP | |||
05 /
YOKOYAMA, Toshinobu, Panasonic Ev Energy Co., Ltd. 555, Sakaijuku Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0452 / JP | |||
06 /
FUKUDA, Shinsuke, Panasonic Ev Energy Co., Ltd. 555, Sakaijuku Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0452 / JP | |||
07 /
TAKAHASHI, Yasuhiro, Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-0826 / JP | |||
08 /
KATSUTA, Toshihiro, Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-0826 / JP | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2001/41] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99973172.2 | 29.11.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999JP06671 | Priority number, date | JP19980337820 | 27.11.1998 Original published format: JP 33782098 | [2001/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0033398 | Date: | 08.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1143541 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143541 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1143541 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.06.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M10/50 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
H01M10/647 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/6551 (EP,US);
H01M10/6557 (EP,US);
H01M10/6562 (EP,US);
H01M50/209 (EP,US);
H01M50/289 (EP,US);
H01M50/51 (EP,US);
H01M50/264 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/50] |
Former [2004/22] | AT, BE, CH, LI | ||
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SPEICHERBATTERIE | [2001/41] | English: | STORAGE BATTERY | [2001/41] | French: | ACCUMULATEUR | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2001 | Translation filed | 19.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2001 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.06.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 18.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2006 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0714616 ; | [X]EP0762528 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,9 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2745422 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1,2,7 * figures 1-3 *; | [XP]EP0952620 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-9* figures 1,3,7,9,11,13,14 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 1995, no. 04, & JP07014616 A 19950117 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7,9 * abstract * | [X] - BULLOUGH R P ET AL, "New designs of valve-regulated lead-acid batteries for rack mounted telecommunications applications", TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENERGY CONFERENCE, 1998. INTELEC. TWENTIETH INTERNATIONAL SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 4-8 OCT. 1998, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19981004), ISBN 0-7803-5069-3, pages 93 - 102, XP010350647 [X] 1,6 * pages 99,100 * * figures 2-5,10,11 * | International search | [Y]JPS5023619U ; | [X]JPH03109269U ; | [X]JPH0714616 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD); | [X]JPH09219181 (SONY CORP, et al); | [Y]JPH09306447 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH10106521 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH10154494 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY); | [X]US5766801 (INOUE HIROSHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH0714616 |