EP1133893 - AN ADAPTIVE CONNECTION ADMISSION CONTROL SCHEME FOR PACKET NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABOUL-MAGD, Osama, S. 53 Stonemeadow Drive Kanata, Ontario K2M 2K2 / CA | 02 /
RABIE, Sameh, A. 30 Balding Crescent Kanata, Ontario K2K 2L3 / CA | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al Scott & York Intelleczual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2001/38] | Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road St Albans, Herts. AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99973215.9 | 30.11.1999 | [2001/38] | WO1999IB01922 | Priority number, date | US19980203104 | 01.12.1998 Original published format: US 203104 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0033606 | Date: | 08.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1133893 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04L12/56 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
H04L12/5602 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L2012/562 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5621 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5632 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5638 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHEMA FÜR ANGEPASSTE VERBINDUNGSZULASSUNGSSTEUERUNGEN FÜR PAKETNETZE | [2001/38] | English: | AN ADAPTIVE CONNECTION ADMISSION CONTROL SCHEME FOR PACKET NETWORKS | [2001/38] | French: | PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE D'ADMISSION DE CONNEXION ADAPTATIF POUR RESEAUX DE TRANSMISSION PAR PAQUETS | [2001/38] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 30.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/31] | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]EP0862299 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,13-18,26 * figure 1 * * page 4, line 53 - page 5, line 33 * * page 21, line 20 - line 51 * [A] 6-11,19-24 [Y] 12,25; | [A]WO9826612 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA], et al) [A] 5,13,18,26 * figures 1,4,6 * * page 13, line 7 - line 25 *; | [XA] - QIANG REN ET AL, "A hybrid model and measurement based connection admission control and bandwidth allocation scheme for ATM networks", IEEE GLOBECOM 1998 (CAT. NO. 98CH36250), IEEE GLOBECOM 1998, SYDNEY,NSW,AUSTRALIA, 8-12 NOV. 1998, 1998, Piscataway, NJ, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-4984-9, pages 2030 - 2038 vol.4, XP002132183 [X] 1,14 * abstract * * page 2030, column 1, line 29 - line 35 * * page 2031, column 1, line 58 - line 64 * [A] 2,15 | [Y] - JAMOUSSI B ET AL, "PERFORMANCE EVALUATION OF CONNECTION ADMISSION CONTROL TECHNIQUES IN ATM NETWORKS", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1996), ISBN 0-7803-3337-3, pages 659 - 664, XP000742224 [Y] 12,25 * figure 1 * * page 659, column 2, line 11 - line 27 * * page 660, column 1, paragraph 2.1 * * page 660, column 2, line 2.2 * |