Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001054016 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP22967299 | 16.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000232630 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP5003999 | 26.02.1999 | JP34648898 | 07.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1065878 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9906811 | 06.12.1999 | JP5003999 | 26.02.1999 | JP34648898 | 07.12.1998 | JP22967299 | 16.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2320347 | 15.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9906811 | 06.12.1999 | JP5003999 | 26.02.1999 | JP34648898 | 07.12.1998 | JP22967299 | 16.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6618095 | 09.09.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP9906811 | 06.12.1999 | JP5003999 | 26.02.1999 | JP34648898 | 07.12.1998 | JP22967299 | 16.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0035189 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP5003999 | 26.02.1999 | JP34648898 | 07.12.1998 | JP22967299 | 16.08.1999 |