blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1152940

EP1152940 - TRUCK AERODYNAMIC A-PILLAR DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.12.2004
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.02.2005  [2005/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Truck Intellectual Property Company, LLC.
4201 Winfield Road
Warrenville, IL 60555 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/09]For all designated states
International Truck Intellectual Property Company, LLC.
4201 Winfield Road
Warrenville, IL 60555 / US
Former [2001/46]For all designated states
International Truck and Engine Corporation
455 N. Cityfront Plaza Drive, Suite 1300
Chicago, IL 60611 / US
Inventor(s)01 / OLSON, M., Eugene
23952 W Lakeshore Dr
Brimlay, MI 49715 / US
 [2002/12]
Former [2001/46]01 / OLSON, M., Eugene
10719 Brandywine Drive
Fort Wayne, IN 46845 / US
Representative(s)Kopp, Stephan, et al
Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro
Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/46]Kopp, Stephan, et al
Kuhnen & Wacker, Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, Prins-Ludwig-Strasse 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date99973714.120.10.1999
[2001/46]
WO1999US24587
Priority number, dateUS19990121190P23.02.1999         Original published format: US 121190 P
US1999029351115.04.1999         Original published format: US 293511
[2001/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0050293
Date:31.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1152940
Date:14.11.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1152940
Date:11.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US31.08.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2002
ClassificationIPC:B62D35/00
[2001/46]
CPC:
B62D33/06 (EP,US); B62D35/00 (EP,US); B62D35/001 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2004/07]
Former [2001/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENTWURF FÜR EINE AERODINAMISCHE LASTKRAFTWAGEN-A-sÄULE[2001/46]
English:TRUCK AERODYNAMIC A-PILLAR DESIGN[2001/46]
French:CONCEPTION DE MONTANT DE PARE-BRISE AERODYNAMIQUE POUR CAMION[2001/46]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2001National basic fee paid 
22.05.2001Search fee paid 
22.05.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/46]
02.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2003Fee for grant paid
21.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS55160667  ;
 [A]US4210354  (CANNING ROBERT B [US]) [A] 1,11-13 * figures 2,3 ** column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 5 *;
 [A]US4932716  (MARLOWE HUSTON [US], et al) [A] 1,11-13 * column A; figure - * * column 1, line 28 - column 2, line 19 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810310), vol. 005, no. 037, Database accession no. (M - 058), & JP55160667 A 19801213 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1,11-13 * abstract *
International search[A]US1439919  ;
 [A]US5056850  (KATCHERIAN RICKY V [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.