EP1182026 - HOT RUNNER UNIT AND HOT RUNNER METAL MOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHINKO SELLBIC CO., LTD. 41-4, Higashi-magome 1-chome, Ota-ku Tokyo 143-0022 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states Shinko Sellbic Co., Ltd. 41-4, Higashi-magome 1-chome, Ota-ku Tokyo 143-0022 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEUCHI, Hiroshi 41-4, Higashimagome 1-chome Ota-ku Tokyo 143-0022 / JP | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Kern, Ralf M. advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | [2009/40] |
Former [2002/09] | Kern, Ralf M., Dipl.-Ing. Ralf M. Kern & Partner Postfach 14 03 29 80453 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99973770.3 | 09.03.1999 | [2002/09] | WO1999JP01123 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0053388 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1182026 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/26, B29C45/27 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
B29C45/27 (EP);
B29C45/2673 (EP);
B29C45/2725 (EP);
B29C45/278 (EP);
B29C2045/2719 (EP);
B29C2045/2772 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/09] | B29C45/26 | Designated contracting states | DE [2002/09] | Title | German: | HEISSKANAL UND SPRITZGIESSWERKZEUG MIT EINEM HEISSKANAL | [2002/09] | English: | HOT RUNNER UNIT AND HOT RUNNER METAL MOLD | [2002/09] | French: | UNITE A CANAUX CHAUFFES ET MOULE METALLIQUE A CANAUX CHAUFFES | [2002/09] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2001 | Translation filed | 05.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 11.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/05] | 27.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4514160 (DAVIDSMEYER WALTER F) [A] 1,4,7,10,13,16,19,22 * figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 31 - line 61 *; | [A]EP0630733 (GELLERT JOBST U) [A] 1,4,7,10,13,16,19,22 * column 3, line 11 - line 39 *; | [A]US5225211 (IMAIDA HIROSHI ET AL) [A] 1,4,7,10,13,16,19,22 * column 2, line 41 - line 46 *; | [A]EP0882563 (GELLERT JOBST U) [A] 1,4,7,10,13,16,19,22 * column 3, line 6 - line 43 * * figures 3,5 *; | [A]US4043726 (HIRAYAMA EIICHI ET AL) [A] 1,4,7,10,13,16,19,22 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 41 *; | [A]DE3211342 (VOLK WILHELM) [A] 1,4,7,10,13,16,19,22 * page 11, line 4 - page 13, line 10 * * figure 4 * | International search | [A]JPH04214315 ; | [A]JPH02289320 ; | [A]JPH0970853 ; | [A]JPH0752203 |