EP1290316 - APPARATUS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CRANKCASE EMISSIONS MATERIALS IN A POSITIVE CRANKCASE VENTILATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEKKO INTERNATIONAL, L.C. 3829 West Locust Street Davenport Iowa 52804 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states GEKKO INTERNATIONAL, L.C. 3829 West Locust Street Davenport, Iowa 52804 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIOTTE, Ronald, A. 6710 116th Street Blue Grass, IA 52726 / US | 02 /
NACHTMAN, Charles, T. 395 Moore Heights Dubuque, IA 52003 / US | 03 /
EDWARDS, James, R. 390 Hill Street Dubuque, IA 52001 / US | 04 /
GREGORY, Robert, L. 13608 Wesley Stevens Road Farmington, AR 72730 / US | 05 /
WINTER, Frank 1235 31st Avenue San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [2003/11] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 99973853.7 | 15.10.1999 | [2003/11] | WO1999US24245 | Priority number, date | US19990310486 | 12.05.1999 Original published format: US 310486 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0069537 | Date: | 23.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1290316 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01M13/04, B01D47/02 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
B01D47/021 (EP,US);
F01M13/00 (KR);
F01M13/022 (EP,US);
F01M13/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/11] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON STOFFEN AUS KURBELGEHÄUSE-EMISSIONEN IN EINEM ÜBERDRUCKKURBELGEHÄUSENENTLÜFTUNGSSYSTEM | [2003/11] | English: | APPARATUS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CRANKCASE EMISSIONS MATERIALS IN A POSITIVE CRANKCASE VENTILATION SYSTEM | [2003/11] | French: | APPAREIL POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES MATIERES EMISSIVES D'UN SYSTEME DE RECYCLAGE DES GAZ DE CARTER | [2003/11] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2001 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 20.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/43] | 06.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]WO9925972 (GEKKO INT L C [US]) [AP] 1,27 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5243950 (DALUPAN ROMULO V [US]) [AD] 1,27 * column W *; | [AD]US4073273 (MCMAHON ROY C) [AD] 1,27 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5450835 (WAGNER RICHARD A [US]) [A] 1,27 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4167164 (BACHMANN MAX) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]JPS5518256 ; | [A]SU1584981 ; | [A]DE19642218 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE7624787U (DELBAG-LUFTFILTER) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE7301870U (L.LEISEGANG) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 46, Database accession no. (C - 6)<528>, & JP55018256 A 19800208 (AMANO K.K.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - SOVIET PATENTS ABSTRACTS, 6, Derwent World Patents Index, (19910529), vol. 91, no. 15, Database accession no. 91-108186-15, XP002218852 & SU1584981 A 19900815 (LENINGRAD TEXTILE LIGHT) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5243950 (DALUPAN ROMULO V [US]) |