EP1212015 - INSTRUMENT FOR INSERTING INTERVERTEBRAL IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spine Solutions Inc. 1302 Wrights Lane East West Chester, PA 19380 / US | [2007/24] |
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states Spine Solutions Inc. 505 Park Avenue 14th floor New York, NY 10022 / US | ||
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Spine Solution Inc. 505 Park Avenue 14th Floor New york, NY 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEYERSDORFF, Boris Fehrbellinerstr. 38 10119 Berlin / DE | 02 /
MARNAY, Thierry 290, rue Valéry Larbaud F-34080 Montpellier / FR | [2007/42] |
Former [2002/24] | 01 /
BEYERSDORFF, Boris Möhringerstrasse 5 D-78532 Tuttlingen / DE | ||
02 /
MARNAY, Thierry 290, rue Valéry Larbaud F-34080 Montpellier / FR | Representative(s) | Jochem, Bernd, et al Heinrich - Erb - Partner Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Hanauer Landstrasse 126-128 60314 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Jochem, Bernd, Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing, et al Patentanwälte Beyer & Jochem, Klettenbergstrasse 13 60322 Frankfurt/Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 99974009.5 | 14.09.1999 | [2002/24] | WO1999EP06803 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0119295 | Date: | 22.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1212015 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1212015 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44, A61F2/46 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
A61F2/4611 (EP,US);
A61F2/4425 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0256 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30383 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30604 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30662 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30808 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30841 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30884 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30892 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30904 (EP,US);
A61F2002/443 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4622 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4627 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4628 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/24] | Extension states | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSETZINSTRUMENT FÜR EIN ZWISCHENWIRBELIMPLANTAT | [2002/24] | English: | INSTRUMENT FOR INSERTING INTERVERTEBRAL IMPLANTS | [2002/24] | French: | INSTRUMENT D'INSERTION POUR IMPLANT INTERVERTEBRAL | [2002/24] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 28.05.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07003422.8 / EP1792586 | EP07003474.9 / EP1792587 | EP07003475.6 / EP1779815 | EP07003476.4 / EP1792588 | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.02.2007 | DK | 21.02.2007 | FI | 21.02.2007 | IE | 21.02.2007 | NL | 21.02.2007 | GR | 22.05.2007 | PT | 23.07.2007 | LU | 14.09.2007 | BE | 30.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/40] | DK | 21.02.2007 | |
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 21.02.2007 | |
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | DK | 21.02.2007 | |
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | DK | 21.02.2007 | |
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0333990 (LINK WALDEMAR GMBH CO [DE]) [A] 1,4,7,9,17 * figures 1-7 * * column 6, line 22 - column 7, line 3 * * column 7, line 25 - line 40 *; | [DA]EP0471821 (JBS SA [FR]) [DA] 1,9,14 * figures 1,2,10,11 * * column 6, lines 7-20 * * column 9, lines 20-32 *; | [DA]DE4328690 (MAN CERAMICS GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2737656 (JBS SA [FR]) [A] 1,4,7,9,12,14-16 * figures 1-4 * * claims 1,2 *; | [E]DE29916078U (AESCULAP AG & CO KG [DE]) [E] 1-25* claims 1-25 * | by applicant | EP0471821 | DE4328690 |